JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 101

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 101

Last updated on December 11, 2021. Created on December 10, 2021.

Questions

1) 353 x 173=
2) 789 x 592=
3) 839 x 477=
4) 966 x 965=
5) 933 x 171=
6) 544 x 466=
7) 201 x 883=
8) 546 x 367=
9) 211 x 403=
10) 922 x 871=
11) 226 x 366=
12) 578 x 667=
13) 657 x 376=
14) 948 x 247=
15) 717 x 876=
16) 655 x 259=
17) 876 x 471=
18) 602 x 419=
19) 364 x 379=
20) 113 x 538=
21) 751 x 279=
22) 895 x 510=
23) 639 x 941=
24) 487 x 471=
25) 632 x 337=
26) 728 x 303=
27) 127 x 876=
28) 431 x 229=
29) 444 x 586=
30) 529 x 196=
31) 890 x 744=
32) 308 x 287=
33) 168 x 561=
34) 906 x 246=
35) 763 x 947=
36) 828 x 879=
37) 769 x 829=
38) 450 x 950=
39) 569 x 405=
40) 286 x 997=
41) 501 x 310=
42) 396 x 922=
43) 931 x 323=
44) 940 x 928=
45) 546 x 483=
46) 139 x 581=
47) 265 x 552=
48) 397 x 138=
49) 993 x 999=
50) 265 x 887=




Answers

1) 353 * 173 = 61069 2) 789 * 592 = 467088 3) 839 * 477 = 400203 4) 966 * 965 = 932190 5) 933 * 171 = 159543 6) 544 * 466 = 253504 7) 201 * 883 = 177483 8) 546 * 367 = 200382 9) 211 * 403 = 85033 10) 922 * 871 = 803062 11) 226 * 366 = 82716 12) 578 * 667 = 385526 13) 657 * 376 = 247032 14) 948 * 247 = 234156 15) 717 * 876 = 628092 16) 655 * 259 = 169645 17) 876 * 471 = 412596 18) 602 * 419 = 252238 19) 364 * 379 = 137956 20) 113 * 538 = 60794 21) 751 * 279 = 209529 22) 895 * 510 = 456450 23) 639 * 941 = 601299 24) 487 * 471 = 229377 25) 632 * 337 = 212984 26) 728 * 303 = 220584 27) 127 * 876 = 111252 28) 431 * 229 = 98699 29) 444 * 586 = 260184 30) 529 * 196 = 103684 31) 890 * 744 = 662160 32) 308 * 287 = 88396 33) 168 * 561 = 94248 34) 906 * 246 = 222876 35) 763 * 947 = 722561 36) 828 * 879 = 727812 37) 769 * 829 = 637501 38) 450 * 950 = 427500 39) 569 * 405 = 230445 40) 286 * 997 = 285142 41) 501 * 310 = 155310 42) 396 * 922 = 365112 43) 931 * 323 = 300713 44) 940 * 928 = 872320 45) 546 * 483 = 263718 46) 139 * 581 = 80759 47) 265 * 552 = 146280 48) 397 * 138 = 54786 49) 993 * 999 = 992007 50) 265 * 887 = 235055

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 101

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 101