JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 82

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 82

Last updated on December 11, 2021. Created on November 21, 2021.

Questions

1) 837 x 319=
2) 347 x 363=
3) 944 x 626=
4) 615 x 652=
5) 178 x 106=
6) 300 x 359=
7) 657 x 250=
8) 809 x 350=
9) 511 x 250=
10) 724 x 502=
11) 110 x 102=
12) 947 x 99=
13) 144 x 622=
14) 709 x 158=
15) 516 x 445=
16) 418 x 113=
17) 166 x 506=
18) 585 x 359=
19) 539 x 906=
20) 338 x 842=
21) 424 x 881=
22) 750 x 941=
23) 816 x 526=
24) 372 x 831=
25) 734 x 449=
26) 523 x 558=
27) 539 x 148=
28) 406 x 177=
29) 691 x 753=
30) 958 x 730=
31) 824 x 121=
32) 817 x 957=
33) 496 x 595=
34) 285 x 417=
35) 154 x 791=
36) 615 x 829=
37) 972 x 670=
38) 263 x 427=
39) 561 x 727=
40) 345 x 270=
41) 532 x 469=
42) 156 x 345=
43) 284 x 859=
44) 411 x 871=
45) 660 x 617=
46) 238 x 535=
47) 427 x 913=
48) 278 x 955=
49) 742 x 412=
50) 992 x 980=




Answers

1) 837 * 319 = 267003 2) 347 * 363 = 125961 3) 944 * 626 = 590944 4) 615 * 652 = 400980 5) 178 * 106 = 18868 6) 300 * 359 = 107700 7) 657 * 250 = 164250 8) 809 * 350 = 283150 9) 511 * 250 = 127750 10) 724 * 502 = 363448 11) 110 * 102 = 11220 12) 947 * 99 = 93753 13) 144 * 622 = 89568 14) 709 * 158 = 112022 15) 516 * 445 = 229620 16) 418 * 113 = 47234 17) 166 * 506 = 83996 18) 585 * 359 = 210015 19) 539 * 906 = 488334 20) 338 * 842 = 284596 21) 424 * 881 = 373544 22) 750 * 941 = 705750 23) 816 * 526 = 429216 24) 372 * 831 = 309132 25) 734 * 449 = 329566 26) 523 * 558 = 291834 27) 539 * 148 = 79772 28) 406 * 177 = 71862 29) 691 * 753 = 520323 30) 958 * 730 = 699340 31) 824 * 121 = 99704 32) 817 * 957 = 781869 33) 496 * 595 = 295120 34) 285 * 417 = 118845 35) 154 * 791 = 121814 36) 615 * 829 = 509835 37) 972 * 670 = 651240 38) 263 * 427 = 112301 39) 561 * 727 = 407847 40) 345 * 270 = 93150 41) 532 * 469 = 249508 42) 156 * 345 = 53820 43) 284 * 859 = 243956 44) 411 * 871 = 357981 45) 660 * 617 = 407220 46) 238 * 535 = 127330 47) 427 * 913 = 389851 48) 278 * 955 = 265490 49) 742 * 412 = 305704 50) 992 * 980 = 972160

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 82

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 82