JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 83

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 83

Last updated on December 11, 2021. Created on November 22, 2021.

Questions

1) 994 x 717=
2) 560 x 643=
3) 342 x 979=
4) 963 x 911=
5) 762 x 217=
6) 637 x 678=
7) 976 x 184=
8) 771 x 895=
9) 378 x 249=
10) 249 x 799=
11) 774 x 327=
12) 852 x 287=
13) 248 x 772=
14) 914 x 873=
15) 189 x 178=
16) 849 x 862=
17) 358 x 737=
18) 431 x 850=
19) 151 x 569=
20) 474 x 945=
21) 324 x 542=
22) 425 x 457=
23) 958 x 745=
24) 658 x 587=
25) 722 x 875=
26) 579 x 427=
27) 769 x 270=
28) 126 x 939=
29) 203 x 472=
30) 594 x 494=
31) 687 x 145=
32) 635 x 532=
33) 495 x 473=
34) 426 x 685=
35) 525 x 595=
36) 869 x 325=
37) 576 x 410=
38) 916 x 982=
39) 187 x 340=
40) 998 x 150=
41) 894 x 134=
42) 369 x 258=
43) 849 x 402=
44) 130 x 591=
45) 951 x 767=
46) 737 x 374=
47) 203 x 950=
48) 550 x 582=
49) 822 x 507=
50) 647 x 319=




Answers

1) 994 * 717 = 712698 2) 560 * 643 = 360080 3) 342 * 979 = 334818 4) 963 * 911 = 877293 5) 762 * 217 = 165354 6) 637 * 678 = 431886 7) 976 * 184 = 179584 8) 771 * 895 = 690045 9) 378 * 249 = 94122 10) 249 * 799 = 198951 11) 774 * 327 = 253098 12) 852 * 287 = 244524 13) 248 * 772 = 191456 14) 914 * 873 = 797922 15) 189 * 178 = 33642 16) 849 * 862 = 731838 17) 358 * 737 = 263846 18) 431 * 850 = 366350 19) 151 * 569 = 85919 20) 474 * 945 = 447930 21) 324 * 542 = 175608 22) 425 * 457 = 194225 23) 958 * 745 = 713710 24) 658 * 587 = 386246 25) 722 * 875 = 631750 26) 579 * 427 = 247233 27) 769 * 270 = 207630 28) 126 * 939 = 118314 29) 203 * 472 = 95816 30) 594 * 494 = 293436 31) 687 * 145 = 99615 32) 635 * 532 = 337820 33) 495 * 473 = 234135 34) 426 * 685 = 291810 35) 525 * 595 = 312375 36) 869 * 325 = 282425 37) 576 * 410 = 236160 38) 916 * 982 = 899512 39) 187 * 340 = 63580 40) 998 * 150 = 149700 41) 894 * 134 = 119796 42) 369 * 258 = 95202 43) 849 * 402 = 341298 44) 130 * 591 = 76830 45) 951 * 767 = 729417 46) 737 * 374 = 275638 47) 203 * 950 = 192850 48) 550 * 582 = 320100 49) 822 * 507 = 416754 50) 647 * 319 = 206393

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 83

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 83