JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 86

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 86

Last updated on December 11, 2021. Created on November 25, 2021.

Questions

1) 243 x 187=
2) 570 x 103=
3) 361 x 847=
4) 633 x 941=
5) 492 x 819=
6) 787 x 556=
7) 274 x 346=
8) 986 x 441=
9) 544 x 933=
10) 372 x 420=
11) 759 x 968=
12) 884 x 611=
13) 214 x 961=
14) 387 x 604=
15) 678 x 390=
16) 842 x 919=
17) 210 x 403=
18) 885 x 892=
19) 605 x 467=
20) 955 x 597=
21) 677 x 848=
22) 368 x 938=
23) 952 x 247=
24) 533 x 362=
25) 600 x 662=
26) 998 x 708=
27) 621 x 104=
28) 430 x 430=
29) 297 x 975=
30) 967 x 813=
31) 951 x 989=
32) 808 x 938=
33) 948 x 284=
34) 171 x 694=
35) 874 x 957=
36) 521 x 506=
37) 242 x 885=
38) 238 x 797=
39) 834 x 785=
40) 527 x 417=
41) 648 x 968=
42) 641 x 659=
43) 839 x 653=
44) 210 x 439=
45) 736 x 792=
46) 439 x 814=
47) 338 x 828=
48) 318 x 659=
49) 791 x 226=
50) 228 x 867=




Answers

1) 243 * 187 = 45441 2) 570 * 103 = 58710 3) 361 * 847 = 305767 4) 633 * 941 = 595653 5) 492 * 819 = 402948 6) 787 * 556 = 437572 7) 274 * 346 = 94804 8) 986 * 441 = 434826 9) 544 * 933 = 507552 10) 372 * 420 = 156240 11) 759 * 968 = 734712 12) 884 * 611 = 540124 13) 214 * 961 = 205654 14) 387 * 604 = 233748 15) 678 * 390 = 264420 16) 842 * 919 = 773798 17) 210 * 403 = 84630 18) 885 * 892 = 789420 19) 605 * 467 = 282535 20) 955 * 597 = 570135 21) 677 * 848 = 574096 22) 368 * 938 = 345184 23) 952 * 247 = 235144 24) 533 * 362 = 192946 25) 600 * 662 = 397200 26) 998 * 708 = 706584 27) 621 * 104 = 64584 28) 430 * 430 = 184900 29) 297 * 975 = 289575 30) 967 * 813 = 786171 31) 951 * 989 = 940539 32) 808 * 938 = 757904 33) 948 * 284 = 269232 34) 171 * 694 = 118674 35) 874 * 957 = 836418 36) 521 * 506 = 263626 37) 242 * 885 = 214170 38) 238 * 797 = 189686 39) 834 * 785 = 654690 40) 527 * 417 = 219759 41) 648 * 968 = 627264 42) 641 * 659 = 422419 43) 839 * 653 = 547867 44) 210 * 439 = 92190 45) 736 * 792 = 582912 46) 439 * 814 = 357346 47) 338 * 828 = 279864 48) 318 * 659 = 209562 49) 791 * 226 = 178766 50) 228 * 867 = 197676

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 86

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 86