JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 87

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 87

Last updated on December 11, 2021. Created on November 26, 2021.

Questions

1) 567 x 368=
2) 984 x 551=
3) 503 x 697=
4) 341 x 252=
5) 374 x 740=
6) 380 x 483=
7) 319 x 915=
8) 689 x 765=
9) 372 x 234=
10) 432 x 992=
11) 242 x 427=
12) 245 x 176=
13) 838 x 206=
14) 499 x 869=
15) 480 x 378=
16) 211 x 655=
17) 225 x 328=
18) 251 x 598=
19) 627 x 557=
20) 521 x 883=
21) 559 x 966=
22) 279 x 534=
23) 496 x 440=
24) 670 x 595=
25) 778 x 135=
26) 506 x 540=
27) 147 x 960=
28) 729 x 445=
29) 355 x 299=
30) 815 x 511=
31) 648 x 108=
32) 561 x 599=
33) 976 x 256=
34) 766 x 547=
35) 523 x 746=
36) 304 x 196=
37) 530 x 806=
38) 550 x 959=
39) 292 x 350=
40) 523 x 432=
41) 678 x 846=
42) 171 x 368=
43) 774 x 130=
44) 673 x 203=
45) 295 x 234=
46) 702 x 319=
47) 181 x 796=
48) 663 x 122=
49) 797 x 617=
50) 362 x 677=




Answers

1) 567 * 368 = 208656 2) 984 * 551 = 542184 3) 503 * 697 = 350591 4) 341 * 252 = 85932 5) 374 * 740 = 276760 6) 380 * 483 = 183540 7) 319 * 915 = 291885 8) 689 * 765 = 527085 9) 372 * 234 = 87048 10) 432 * 992 = 428544 11) 242 * 427 = 103334 12) 245 * 176 = 43120 13) 838 * 206 = 172628 14) 499 * 869 = 433631 15) 480 * 378 = 181440 16) 211 * 655 = 138205 17) 225 * 328 = 73800 18) 251 * 598 = 150098 19) 627 * 557 = 349239 20) 521 * 883 = 460043 21) 559 * 966 = 539994 22) 279 * 534 = 148986 23) 496 * 440 = 218240 24) 670 * 595 = 398650 25) 778 * 135 = 105030 26) 506 * 540 = 273240 27) 147 * 960 = 141120 28) 729 * 445 = 324405 29) 355 * 299 = 106145 30) 815 * 511 = 416465 31) 648 * 108 = 69984 32) 561 * 599 = 336039 33) 976 * 256 = 249856 34) 766 * 547 = 419002 35) 523 * 746 = 390158 36) 304 * 196 = 59584 37) 530 * 806 = 427180 38) 550 * 959 = 527450 39) 292 * 350 = 102200 40) 523 * 432 = 225936 41) 678 * 846 = 573588 42) 171 * 368 = 62928 43) 774 * 130 = 100620 44) 673 * 203 = 136619 45) 295 * 234 = 69030 46) 702 * 319 = 223938 47) 181 * 796 = 144076 48) 663 * 122 = 80886 49) 797 * 617 = 491749 50) 362 * 677 = 245074

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 87

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 87