JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 93

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 93

Last updated on December 11, 2021. Created on December 2, 2021.

Questions

1) 832 x 805=
2) 479 x 247=
3) 959 x 389=
4) 692 x 308=
5) 243 x 736=
6) 526 x 370=
7) 874 x 478=
8) 828 x 526=
9) 940 x 421=
10) 498 x 676=
11) 780 x 596=
12) 501 x 882=
13) 305 x 674=
14) 222 x 109=
15) 416 x 202=
16) 727 x 490=
17) 459 x 784=
18) 512 x 796=
19) 419 x 353=
20) 677 x 375=
21) 290 x 500=
22) 592 x 619=
23) 192 x 574=
24) 763 x 720=
25) 655 x 656=
26) 837 x 107=
27) 700 x 920=
28) 416 x 350=
29) 240 x 459=
30) 238 x 668=
31) 650 x 539=
32) 273 x 706=
33) 469 x 233=
34) 390 x 226=
35) 994 x 522=
36) 404 x 889=
37) 281 x 436=
38) 117 x 617=
39) 141 x 801=
40) 923 x 911=
41) 515 x 569=
42) 596 x 515=
43) 650 x 948=
44) 105 x 400=
45) 176 x 100=
46) 232 x 542=
47) 155 x 194=
48) 421 x 578=
49) 573 x 550=
50) 394 x 357=




Answers

1) 832 * 805 = 669760 2) 479 * 247 = 118313 3) 959 * 389 = 373051 4) 692 * 308 = 213136 5) 243 * 736 = 178848 6) 526 * 370 = 194620 7) 874 * 478 = 417772 8) 828 * 526 = 435528 9) 940 * 421 = 395740 10) 498 * 676 = 336648 11) 780 * 596 = 464880 12) 501 * 882 = 441882 13) 305 * 674 = 205570 14) 222 * 109 = 24198 15) 416 * 202 = 84032 16) 727 * 490 = 356230 17) 459 * 784 = 359856 18) 512 * 796 = 407552 19) 419 * 353 = 147907 20) 677 * 375 = 253875 21) 290 * 500 = 145000 22) 592 * 619 = 366448 23) 192 * 574 = 110208 24) 763 * 720 = 549360 25) 655 * 656 = 429680 26) 837 * 107 = 89559 27) 700 * 920 = 644000 28) 416 * 350 = 145600 29) 240 * 459 = 110160 30) 238 * 668 = 158984 31) 650 * 539 = 350350 32) 273 * 706 = 192738 33) 469 * 233 = 109277 34) 390 * 226 = 88140 35) 994 * 522 = 518868 36) 404 * 889 = 359156 37) 281 * 436 = 122516 38) 117 * 617 = 72189 39) 141 * 801 = 112941 40) 923 * 911 = 840853 41) 515 * 569 = 293035 42) 596 * 515 = 306940 43) 650 * 948 = 616200 44) 105 * 400 = 42000 45) 176 * 100 = 17600 46) 232 * 542 = 125744 47) 155 * 194 = 30070 48) 421 * 578 = 243338 49) 573 * 550 = 315150 50) 394 * 357 = 140658

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 93

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 93