JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Last updated on December 11, 2021. Created on December 3, 2021.

Questions

1) 763 x 256=
2) 609 x 450=
3) 834 x 471=
4) 755 x 926=
5) 800 x 510=
6) 458 x 561=
7) 935 x 417=
8) 674 x 560=
9) 764 x 548=
10) 613 x 363=
11) 478 x 927=
12) 199 x 662=
13) 714 x 580=
14) 854 x 451=
15) 506 x 259=
16) 657 x 441=
17) 369 x 682=
18) 469 x 198=
19) 912 x 784=
20) 827 x 243=
21) 162 x 303=
22) 801 x 722=
23) 254 x 275=
24) 103 x 251=
25) 542 x 283=
26) 657 x 992=
27) 602 x 966=
28) 134 x 486=
29) 266 x 726=
30) 329 x 854=
31) 617 x 106=
32) 599 x 374=
33) 766 x 499=
34) 579 x 295=
35) 541 x 263=
36) 105 x 447=
37) 229 x 420=
38) 580 x 637=
39) 741 x 291=
40) 708 x 111=
41) 971 x 728=
42) 942 x 607=
43) 452 x 599=
44) 692 x 881=
45) 852 x 826=
46) 200 x 909=
47) 995 x 586=
48) 833 x 578=
49) 359 x 931=
50) 846 x 594=




Answers

1) 763 * 256 = 195328 2) 609 * 450 = 274050 3) 834 * 471 = 392814 4) 755 * 926 = 699130 5) 800 * 510 = 408000 6) 458 * 561 = 256938 7) 935 * 417 = 389895 8) 674 * 560 = 377440 9) 764 * 548 = 418672 10) 613 * 363 = 222519 11) 478 * 927 = 443106 12) 199 * 662 = 131738 13) 714 * 580 = 414120 14) 854 * 451 = 385154 15) 506 * 259 = 131054 16) 657 * 441 = 289737 17) 369 * 682 = 251658 18) 469 * 198 = 92862 19) 912 * 784 = 715008 20) 827 * 243 = 200961 21) 162 * 303 = 49086 22) 801 * 722 = 578322 23) 254 * 275 = 69850 24) 103 * 251 = 25853 25) 542 * 283 = 153386 26) 657 * 992 = 651744 27) 602 * 966 = 581532 28) 134 * 486 = 65124 29) 266 * 726 = 193116 30) 329 * 854 = 280966 31) 617 * 106 = 65402 32) 599 * 374 = 224026 33) 766 * 499 = 382234 34) 579 * 295 = 170805 35) 541 * 263 = 142283 36) 105 * 447 = 46935 37) 229 * 420 = 96180 38) 580 * 637 = 369460 39) 741 * 291 = 215631 40) 708 * 111 = 78588 41) 971 * 728 = 706888 42) 942 * 607 = 571794 43) 452 * 599 = 270748 44) 692 * 881 = 609652 45) 852 * 826 = 703752 46) 200 * 909 = 181800 47) 995 * 586 = 583070 48) 833 * 578 = 481474 49) 359 * 931 = 334229 50) 846 * 594 = 502524

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 94

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94