JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 96

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 96

Last updated on December 11, 2021. Created on December 5, 2021.

Questions

1) 272 x 183=
2) 255 x 853=
3) 332 x 553=
4) 320 x 252=
5) 656 x 771=
6) 699 x 368=
7) 132 x 376=
8) 784 x 415=
9) 163 x 600=
10) 180 x 991=
11) 814 x 783=
12) 287 x 325=
13) 261 x 230=
14) 915 x 381=
15) 904 x 629=
16) 850 x 642=
17) 870 x 146=
18) 100 x 144=
19) 602 x 617=
20) 748 x 609=
21) 411 x 866=
22) 331 x 831=
23) 380 x 749=
24) 206 x 867=
25) 820 x 333=
26) 657 x 743=
27) 961 x 499=
28) 606 x 180=
29) 632 x 686=
30) 392 x 548=
31) 124 x 426=
32) 476 x 892=
33) 779 x 725=
34) 953 x 701=
35) 994 x 341=
36) 139 x 634=
37) 601 x 886=
38) 761 x 471=
39) 693 x 327=
40) 998 x 591=
41) 475 x 337=
42) 904 x 195=
43) 837 x 753=
44) 542 x 757=
45) 429 x 689=
46) 598 x 462=
47) 652 x 528=
48) 456 x 923=
49) 661 x 452=
50) 205 x 291=




Answers

1) 272 * 183 = 49776 2) 255 * 853 = 217515 3) 332 * 553 = 183596 4) 320 * 252 = 80640 5) 656 * 771 = 505776 6) 699 * 368 = 257232 7) 132 * 376 = 49632 8) 784 * 415 = 325360 9) 163 * 600 = 97800 10) 180 * 991 = 178380 11) 814 * 783 = 637362 12) 287 * 325 = 93275 13) 261 * 230 = 60030 14) 915 * 381 = 348615 15) 904 * 629 = 568616 16) 850 * 642 = 545700 17) 870 * 146 = 127020 18) 100 * 144 = 14400 19) 602 * 617 = 371434 20) 748 * 609 = 455532 21) 411 * 866 = 355926 22) 331 * 831 = 275061 23) 380 * 749 = 284620 24) 206 * 867 = 178602 25) 820 * 333 = 273060 26) 657 * 743 = 488151 27) 961 * 499 = 479539 28) 606 * 180 = 109080 29) 632 * 686 = 433552 30) 392 * 548 = 214816 31) 124 * 426 = 52824 32) 476 * 892 = 424592 33) 779 * 725 = 564775 34) 953 * 701 = 668053 35) 994 * 341 = 338954 36) 139 * 634 = 88126 37) 601 * 886 = 532486 38) 761 * 471 = 358431 39) 693 * 327 = 226611 40) 998 * 591 = 589818 41) 475 * 337 = 160075 42) 904 * 195 = 176280 43) 837 * 753 = 630261 44) 542 * 757 = 410294 45) 429 * 689 = 295581 46) 598 * 462 = 276276 47) 652 * 528 = 344256 48) 456 * 923 = 420888 49) 661 * 452 = 298772 50) 205 * 291 = 59655

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 96

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 96