1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 1

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 1

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on September 1, 2020.

Questions

1) 614 x 703=
2) 792 x 366=
3) 594 x 146=
4) 102 x 728=
5) 814 x 446=
6) 146 x 597=
7) 375 x 396=
8) 397 x 534=
9) 309 x 860=
10) 654 x 852=
11) 815 x 189=
12) 471 x 536=
13) 806 x 103=
14) 188 x 769=
15) 565 x 457=
16) 164 x 613=
17) 982 x 487=
18) 829 x 867=
19) 441 x 998=
20) 930 x 214=
21) 248 x 309=
22) 520 x 820=
23) 174 x 806=
24) 942 x 268=
25) 819 x 311=
26) 839 x 584=
27) 115 x 570=
28) 139 x 369=
29) 267 x 469=
30) 439 x 797=
31) 910 x 205=
32) 679 x 355=
33) 231 x 708=
34) 942 x 533=
35) 985 x 764=
36) 199 x 565=
37) 117 x 355=
38) 533 x 904=
39) 313 x 292=
40) 887 x 883=
41) 776 x 436=
42) 696 x 819=
43) 925 x 350=
44) 759 x 733=
45) 606 x 466=
46) 799 x 894=
47) 834 x 323=
48) 873 x 403=
49) 833 x 339=
50) 783 x 906=




Answers

1) 614 * 703 = 431642 2) 792 * 366 = 289872 3) 594 * 146 = 86724 4) 102 * 728 = 74256 5) 814 * 446 = 363044 6) 146 * 597 = 87162 7) 375 * 396 = 148500 8) 397 * 534 = 211998 9) 309 * 860 = 265740 10) 654 * 852 = 557208 11) 815 * 189 = 154035 12) 471 * 536 = 252456 13) 806 * 103 = 83018 14) 188 * 769 = 144572 15) 565 * 457 = 258205 16) 164 * 613 = 100532 17) 982 * 487 = 478234 18) 829 * 867 = 718743 19) 441 * 998 = 440118 20) 930 * 214 = 199020 21) 248 * 309 = 76632 22) 520 * 820 = 426400 23) 174 * 806 = 140244 24) 942 * 268 = 252456 25) 819 * 311 = 254709 26) 839 * 584 = 489976 27) 115 * 570 = 65550 28) 139 * 369 = 51291 29) 267 * 469 = 125223 30) 439 * 797 = 349883 31) 910 * 205 = 186550 32) 679 * 355 = 241045 33) 231 * 708 = 163548 34) 942 * 533 = 502086 35) 985 * 764 = 752540 36) 199 * 565 = 112435 37) 117 * 355 = 41535 38) 533 * 904 = 481832 39) 313 * 292 = 91396 40) 887 * 883 = 783221 41) 776 * 436 = 338336 42) 696 * 819 = 570024 43) 925 * 350 = 323750 44) 759 * 733 = 556347 45) 606 * 466 = 282396 46) 799 * 894 = 714306 47) 834 * 323 = 269382 48) 873 * 403 = 351819 49) 833 * 339 = 282387 50) 783 * 906 = 709398

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 1

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 1