1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 10

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 10

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 10, 2020.

Questions

1) 179 x 690=
2) 635 x 158=
3) 632 x 265=
4) 671 x 368=
5) 916 x 796=
6) 830 x 767=
7) 407 x 117=
8) 277 x 613=
9) 140 x 947=
10) 521 x 443=
11) 883 x 728=
12) 106 x 899=
13) 868 x 346=
14) 407 x 971=
15) 679 x 591=
16) 665 x 385=
17) 606 x 279=
18) 780 x 700=
19) 576 x 795=
20) 804 x 348=
21) 108 x 434=
22) 863 x 139=
23) 831 x 479=
24) 751 x 491=
25) 796 x 738=
26) 685 x 297=
27) 159 x 608=
28) 792 x 864=
29) 464 x 148=
30) 916 x 494=
31) 411 x 803=
32) 108 x 223=
33) 621 x 831=
34) 916 x 655=
35) 617 x 895=
36) 521 x 673=
37) 184 x 138=
38) 742 x 809=
39) 549 x 206=
40) 590 x 511=
41) 140 x 916=
42) 779 x 529=
43) 912 x 912=
44) 176 x 614=
45) 872 x 177=
46) 722 x 574=
47) 219 x 806=
48) 660 x 956=
49) 951 x 801=
50) 512 x 210=




Answers

1) 179 * 690 = 123510 2) 635 * 158 = 100330 3) 632 * 265 = 167480 4) 671 * 368 = 246928 5) 916 * 796 = 729136 6) 830 * 767 = 636610 7) 407 * 117 = 47619 8) 277 * 613 = 169801 9) 140 * 947 = 132580 10) 521 * 443 = 230803 11) 883 * 728 = 642824 12) 106 * 899 = 95294 13) 868 * 346 = 300328 14) 407 * 971 = 395197 15) 679 * 591 = 401289 16) 665 * 385 = 256025 17) 606 * 279 = 169074 18) 780 * 700 = 546000 19) 576 * 795 = 457920 20) 804 * 348 = 279792 21) 108 * 434 = 46872 22) 863 * 139 = 119957 23) 831 * 479 = 398049 24) 751 * 491 = 368741 25) 796 * 738 = 587448 26) 685 * 297 = 203445 27) 159 * 608 = 96672 28) 792 * 864 = 684288 29) 464 * 148 = 68672 30) 916 * 494 = 452504 31) 411 * 803 = 330033 32) 108 * 223 = 24084 33) 621 * 831 = 516051 34) 916 * 655 = 599980 35) 617 * 895 = 552215 36) 521 * 673 = 350633 37) 184 * 138 = 25392 38) 742 * 809 = 600278 39) 549 * 206 = 113094 40) 590 * 511 = 301490 41) 140 * 916 = 128240 42) 779 * 529 = 412091 43) 912 * 912 = 831744 44) 176 * 614 = 108064 45) 872 * 177 = 154344 46) 722 * 574 = 414428 47) 219 * 806 = 176514 48) 660 * 956 = 630960 49) 951 * 801 = 761751 50) 512 * 210 = 107520

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 10

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 10