JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 100

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 100

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 9, 2020.

Questions

1) 960 x 533=
2) 271 x 222=
3) 312 x 492=
4) 387 x 695=
5) 613 x 122=
6) 790 x 679=
7) 586 x 886=
8) 904 x 401=
9) 828 x 566=
10) 200 x 821=
11) 988 x 914=
12) 292 x 774=
13) 294 x 117=
14) 360 x 671=
15) 518 x 366=
16) 886 x 273=
17) 949 x 690=
18) 529 x 635=
19) 416 x 847=
20) 130 x 548=
21) 147 x 446=
22) 236 x 310=
23) 569 x 411=
24) 722 x 610=
25) 445 x 588=
26) 206 x 768=
27) 328 x 923=
28) 703 x 806=
29) 795 x 138=
30) 177 x 649=
31) 396 x 695=
32) 544 x 933=
33) 433 x 255=
34) 407 x 667=
35) 934 x 627=
36) 781 x 377=
37) 127 x 354=
38) 342 x 228=
39) 286 x 984=
40) 977 x 934=
41) 199 x 258=
42) 617 x 108=
43) 457 x 760=
44) 707 x 921=
45) 142 x 517=
46) 879 x 959=
47) 510 x 811=
48) 339 x 314=
49) 249 x 884=
50) 447 x 529=




Answers

1) 960 * 533 = 511680 2) 271 * 222 = 60162 3) 312 * 492 = 153504 4) 387 * 695 = 268965 5) 613 * 122 = 74786 6) 790 * 679 = 536410 7) 586 * 886 = 519196 8) 904 * 401 = 362504 9) 828 * 566 = 468648 10) 200 * 821 = 164200 11) 988 * 914 = 903032 12) 292 * 774 = 226008 13) 294 * 117 = 34398 14) 360 * 671 = 241560 15) 518 * 366 = 189588 16) 886 * 273 = 241878 17) 949 * 690 = 654810 18) 529 * 635 = 335915 19) 416 * 847 = 352352 20) 130 * 548 = 71240 21) 147 * 446 = 65562 22) 236 * 310 = 73160 23) 569 * 411 = 233859 24) 722 * 610 = 440420 25) 445 * 588 = 261660 26) 206 * 768 = 158208 27) 328 * 923 = 302744 28) 703 * 806 = 566618 29) 795 * 138 = 109710 30) 177 * 649 = 114873 31) 396 * 695 = 275220 32) 544 * 933 = 507552 33) 433 * 255 = 110415 34) 407 * 667 = 271469 35) 934 * 627 = 585618 36) 781 * 377 = 294437 37) 127 * 354 = 44958 38) 342 * 228 = 77976 39) 286 * 984 = 281424 40) 977 * 934 = 912518 41) 199 * 258 = 51342 42) 617 * 108 = 66636 43) 457 * 760 = 347320 44) 707 * 921 = 651147 45) 142 * 517 = 73414 46) 879 * 959 = 842961 47) 510 * 811 = 413610 48) 339 * 314 = 106446 49) 249 * 884 = 220116 50) 447 * 529 = 236463

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 100

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 100