JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 103

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 103

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 12, 2020.

Questions

1) 740 x 889=
2) 270 x 379=
3) 884 x 786=
4) 281 x 653=
5) 948 x 734=
6) 822 x 368=
7) 408 x 446=
8) 152 x 679=
9) 895 x 271=
10) 629 x 194=
11) 756 x 141=
12) 344 x 506=
13) 164 x 636=
14) 212 x 110=
15) 794 x 753=
16) 900 x 244=
17) 570 x 498=
18) 996 x 561=
19) 231 x 742=
20) 949 x 541=
21) 481 x 547=
22) 797 x 896=
23) 772 x 338=
24) 999 x 770=
25) 138 x 569=
26) 318 x 683=
27) 274 x 251=
28) 121 x 164=
29) 408 x 738=
30) 592 x 478=
31) 376 x 219=
32) 504 x 352=
33) 608 x 369=
34) 125 x 554=
35) 559 x 694=
36) 262 x 725=
37) 352 x 965=
38) 469 x 322=
39) 549 x 542=
40) 559 x 778=
41) 620 x 538=
42) 283 x 188=
43) 275 x 896=
44) 905 x 681=
45) 933 x 132=
46) 975 x 477=
47) 405 x 864=
48) 897 x 508=
49) 708 x 693=
50) 855 x 384=




Answers

1) 740 * 889 = 657860 2) 270 * 379 = 102330 3) 884 * 786 = 694824 4) 281 * 653 = 183493 5) 948 * 734 = 695832 6) 822 * 368 = 302496 7) 408 * 446 = 181968 8) 152 * 679 = 103208 9) 895 * 271 = 242545 10) 629 * 194 = 122026 11) 756 * 141 = 106596 12) 344 * 506 = 174064 13) 164 * 636 = 104304 14) 212 * 110 = 23320 15) 794 * 753 = 597882 16) 900 * 244 = 219600 17) 570 * 498 = 283860 18) 996 * 561 = 558756 19) 231 * 742 = 171402 20) 949 * 541 = 513409 21) 481 * 547 = 263107 22) 797 * 896 = 714112 23) 772 * 338 = 260936 24) 999 * 770 = 769230 25) 138 * 569 = 78522 26) 318 * 683 = 217194 27) 274 * 251 = 68774 28) 121 * 164 = 19844 29) 408 * 738 = 301104 30) 592 * 478 = 282976 31) 376 * 219 = 82344 32) 504 * 352 = 177408 33) 608 * 369 = 224352 34) 125 * 554 = 69250 35) 559 * 694 = 387946 36) 262 * 725 = 189950 37) 352 * 965 = 339680 38) 469 * 322 = 151018 39) 549 * 542 = 297558 40) 559 * 778 = 434902 41) 620 * 538 = 333560 42) 283 * 188 = 53204 43) 275 * 896 = 246400 44) 905 * 681 = 616305 45) 933 * 132 = 123156 46) 975 * 477 = 465075 47) 405 * 864 = 349920 48) 897 * 508 = 455676 49) 708 * 693 = 490644 50) 855 * 384 = 328320

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 103

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 103