JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 104

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 104

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 13, 2020.

Questions

1) 170 x 907=
2) 300 x 968=
3) 722 x 160=
4) 404 x 366=
5) 431 x 606=
6) 599 x 428=
7) 361 x 976=
8) 823 x 788=
9) 601 x 540=
10) 648 x 704=
11) 435 x 593=
12) 289 x 705=
13) 520 x 637=
14) 402 x 915=
15) 709 x 653=
16) 606 x 547=
17) 967 x 413=
18) 404 x 149=
19) 212 x 762=
20) 893 x 413=
21) 622 x 397=
22) 139 x 786=
23) 532 x 911=
24) 543 x 759=
25) 459 x 768=
26) 281 x 447=
27) 565 x 604=
28) 734 x 888=
29) 412 x 290=
30) 789 x 278=
31) 430 x 535=
32) 656 x 676=
33) 777 x 271=
34) 949 x 139=
35) 365 x 713=
36) 492 x 249=
37) 441 x 786=
38) 124 x 440=
39) 640 x 248=
40) 104 x 663=
41) 926 x 392=
42) 656 x 996=
43) 129 x 419=
44) 366 x 777=
45) 772 x 573=
46) 628 x 490=
47) 591 x 285=
48) 661 x 719=
49) 578 x 767=
50) 350 x 229=




Answers

1) 170 * 907 = 154190 2) 300 * 968 = 290400 3) 722 * 160 = 115520 4) 404 * 366 = 147864 5) 431 * 606 = 261186 6) 599 * 428 = 256372 7) 361 * 976 = 352336 8) 823 * 788 = 648524 9) 601 * 540 = 324540 10) 648 * 704 = 456192 11) 435 * 593 = 257955 12) 289 * 705 = 203745 13) 520 * 637 = 331240 14) 402 * 915 = 367830 15) 709 * 653 = 462977 16) 606 * 547 = 331482 17) 967 * 413 = 399371 18) 404 * 149 = 60196 19) 212 * 762 = 161544 20) 893 * 413 = 368809 21) 622 * 397 = 246934 22) 139 * 786 = 109254 23) 532 * 911 = 484652 24) 543 * 759 = 412137 25) 459 * 768 = 352512 26) 281 * 447 = 125607 27) 565 * 604 = 341260 28) 734 * 888 = 651792 29) 412 * 290 = 119480 30) 789 * 278 = 219342 31) 430 * 535 = 230050 32) 656 * 676 = 443456 33) 777 * 271 = 210567 34) 949 * 139 = 131911 35) 365 * 713 = 260245 36) 492 * 249 = 122508 37) 441 * 786 = 346626 38) 124 * 440 = 54560 39) 640 * 248 = 158720 40) 104 * 663 = 68952 41) 926 * 392 = 362992 42) 656 * 996 = 653376 43) 129 * 419 = 54051 44) 366 * 777 = 284382 45) 772 * 573 = 442356 46) 628 * 490 = 307720 47) 591 * 285 = 168435 48) 661 * 719 = 475259 49) 578 * 767 = 443326 50) 350 * 229 = 80150

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 104

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 104