JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 105

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 105

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 14, 2020.

Questions

1) 981 x 858=
2) 222 x 298=
3) 548 x 264=
4) 994 x 912=
5) 694 x 766=
6) 469 x 604=
7) 826 x 397=
8) 826 x 522=
9) 308 x 701=
10) 924 x 971=
11) 952 x 810=
12) 541 x 524=
13) 985 x 142=
14) 934 x 670=
15) 616 x 800=
16) 340 x 254=
17) 787 x 193=
18) 907 x 206=
19) 635 x 244=
20) 405 x 340=
21) 727 x 538=
22) 611 x 941=
23) 889 x 192=
24) 756 x 606=
25) 657 x 816=
26) 99 x 622=
27) 549 x 898=
28) 459 x 229=
29) 959 x 761=
30) 502 x 379=
31) 534 x 581=
32) 748 x 392=
33) 367 x 118=
34) 114 x 496=
35) 213 x 788=
36) 479 x 218=
37) 861 x 423=
38) 239 x 333=
39) 454 x 450=
40) 824 x 481=
41) 570 x 169=
42) 264 x 117=
43) 433 x 106=
44) 912 x 739=
45) 282 x 172=
46) 765 x 689=
47) 450 x 678=
48) 818 x 582=
49) 633 x 158=
50) 129 x 123=




Answers

1) 981 * 858 = 841698 2) 222 * 298 = 66156 3) 548 * 264 = 144672 4) 994 * 912 = 906528 5) 694 * 766 = 531604 6) 469 * 604 = 283276 7) 826 * 397 = 327922 8) 826 * 522 = 431172 9) 308 * 701 = 215908 10) 924 * 971 = 897204 11) 952 * 810 = 771120 12) 541 * 524 = 283484 13) 985 * 142 = 139870 14) 934 * 670 = 625780 15) 616 * 800 = 492800 16) 340 * 254 = 86360 17) 787 * 193 = 151891 18) 907 * 206 = 186842 19) 635 * 244 = 154940 20) 405 * 340 = 137700 21) 727 * 538 = 391126 22) 611 * 941 = 574951 23) 889 * 192 = 170688 24) 756 * 606 = 458136 25) 657 * 816 = 536112 26) 99 * 622 = 61578 27) 549 * 898 = 493002 28) 459 * 229 = 105111 29) 959 * 761 = 729799 30) 502 * 379 = 190258 31) 534 * 581 = 310254 32) 748 * 392 = 293216 33) 367 * 118 = 43306 34) 114 * 496 = 56544 35) 213 * 788 = 167844 36) 479 * 218 = 104422 37) 861 * 423 = 364203 38) 239 * 333 = 79587 39) 454 * 450 = 204300 40) 824 * 481 = 396344 41) 570 * 169 = 96330 42) 264 * 117 = 30888 43) 433 * 106 = 45898 44) 912 * 739 = 673968 45) 282 * 172 = 48504 46) 765 * 689 = 527085 47) 450 * 678 = 305100 48) 818 * 582 = 476076 49) 633 * 158 = 100014 50) 129 * 123 = 15867

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 105

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 105