JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 108

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 108

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 17, 2020.

Questions

1) 638 x 409=
2) 533 x 635=
3) 536 x 648=
4) 501 x 448=
5) 155 x 871=
6) 801 x 306=
7) 568 x 116=
8) 542 x 503=
9) 322 x 742=
10) 474 x 858=
11) 333 x 693=
12) 359 x 559=
13) 289 x 820=
14) 987 x 168=
15) 977 x 236=
16) 382 x 950=
17) 615 x 179=
18) 655 x 472=
19) 601 x 302=
20) 238 x 885=
21) 995 x 354=
22) 642 x 673=
23) 871 x 496=
24) 329 x 705=
25) 757 x 760=
26) 748 x 222=
27) 246 x 866=
28) 372 x 526=
29) 776 x 988=
30) 705 x 420=
31) 909 x 902=
32) 260 x 751=
33) 730 x 861=
34) 601 x 859=
35) 559 x 584=
36) 948 x 597=
37) 183 x 738=
38) 688 x 600=
39) 954 x 541=
40) 776 x 444=
41) 183 x 293=
42) 946 x 342=
43) 305 x 438=
44) 912 x 167=
45) 104 x 768=
46) 695 x 483=
47) 752 x 438=
48) 162 x 606=
49) 489 x 249=
50) 994 x 699=




Answers

1) 638 * 409 = 260942 2) 533 * 635 = 338455 3) 536 * 648 = 347328 4) 501 * 448 = 224448 5) 155 * 871 = 135005 6) 801 * 306 = 245106 7) 568 * 116 = 65888 8) 542 * 503 = 272626 9) 322 * 742 = 238924 10) 474 * 858 = 406692 11) 333 * 693 = 230769 12) 359 * 559 = 200681 13) 289 * 820 = 236980 14) 987 * 168 = 165816 15) 977 * 236 = 230572 16) 382 * 950 = 362900 17) 615 * 179 = 110085 18) 655 * 472 = 309160 19) 601 * 302 = 181502 20) 238 * 885 = 210630 21) 995 * 354 = 352230 22) 642 * 673 = 432066 23) 871 * 496 = 432016 24) 329 * 705 = 231945 25) 757 * 760 = 575320 26) 748 * 222 = 166056 27) 246 * 866 = 213036 28) 372 * 526 = 195672 29) 776 * 988 = 766688 30) 705 * 420 = 296100 31) 909 * 902 = 819918 32) 260 * 751 = 195260 33) 730 * 861 = 628530 34) 601 * 859 = 516259 35) 559 * 584 = 326456 36) 948 * 597 = 565956 37) 183 * 738 = 135054 38) 688 * 600 = 412800 39) 954 * 541 = 516114 40) 776 * 444 = 344544 41) 183 * 293 = 53619 42) 946 * 342 = 323532 43) 305 * 438 = 133590 44) 912 * 167 = 152304 45) 104 * 768 = 79872 46) 695 * 483 = 335685 47) 752 * 438 = 329376 48) 162 * 606 = 98172 49) 489 * 249 = 121761 50) 994 * 699 = 694806

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 108

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 108