1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 11

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 11

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 11, 2020.

Questions

1) 930 x 252=
2) 524 x 540=
3) 781 x 825=
4) 411 x 358=
5) 861 x 830=
6) 953 x 963=
7) 846 x 533=
8) 954 x 501=
9) 329 x 608=
10) 933 x 199=
11) 929 x 112=
12) 820 x 366=
13) 637 x 874=
14) 786 x 797=
15) 566 x 188=
16) 916 x 108=
17) 850 x 534=
18) 445 x 494=
19) 999 x 249=
20) 692 x 264=
21) 857 x 262=
22) 151 x 590=
23) 480 x 259=
24) 317 x 281=
25) 380 x 781=
26) 360 x 126=
27) 260 x 347=
28) 342 x 502=
29) 966 x 730=
30) 873 x 605=
31) 985 x 763=
32) 140 x 942=
33) 149 x 904=
34) 911 x 132=
35) 148 x 264=
36) 970 x 124=
37) 683 x 215=
38) 220 x 716=
39) 802 x 186=
40) 112 x 149=
41) 772 x 859=
42) 514 x 416=
43) 594 x 692=
44) 966 x 587=
45) 242 x 100=
46) 917 x 869=
47) 619 x 105=
48) 860 x 430=
49) 100 x 271=
50) 898 x 831=




Answers

1) 930 * 252 = 234360 2) 524 * 540 = 282960 3) 781 * 825 = 644325 4) 411 * 358 = 147138 5) 861 * 830 = 714630 6) 953 * 963 = 917739 7) 846 * 533 = 450918 8) 954 * 501 = 477954 9) 329 * 608 = 200032 10) 933 * 199 = 185667 11) 929 * 112 = 104048 12) 820 * 366 = 300120 13) 637 * 874 = 556738 14) 786 * 797 = 626442 15) 566 * 188 = 106408 16) 916 * 108 = 98928 17) 850 * 534 = 453900 18) 445 * 494 = 219830 19) 999 * 249 = 248751 20) 692 * 264 = 182688 21) 857 * 262 = 224534 22) 151 * 590 = 89090 23) 480 * 259 = 124320 24) 317 * 281 = 89077 25) 380 * 781 = 296780 26) 360 * 126 = 45360 27) 260 * 347 = 90220 28) 342 * 502 = 171684 29) 966 * 730 = 705180 30) 873 * 605 = 528165 31) 985 * 763 = 751555 32) 140 * 942 = 131880 33) 149 * 904 = 134696 34) 911 * 132 = 120252 35) 148 * 264 = 39072 36) 970 * 124 = 120280 37) 683 * 215 = 146845 38) 220 * 716 = 157520 39) 802 * 186 = 149172 40) 112 * 149 = 16688 41) 772 * 859 = 663148 42) 514 * 416 = 213824 43) 594 * 692 = 411048 44) 966 * 587 = 567042 45) 242 * 100 = 24200 46) 917 * 869 = 796873 47) 619 * 105 = 64995 48) 860 * 430 = 369800 49) 100 * 271 = 27100 50) 898 * 831 = 746238

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 11

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 11