JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 110

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 110

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 19, 2020.

Questions

1) 293 x 519=
2) 282 x 610=
3) 750 x 784=
4) 202 x 379=
5) 442 x 730=
6) 401 x 250=
7) 798 x 413=
8) 822 x 736=
9) 242 x 187=
10) 104 x 982=
11) 869 x 849=
12) 934 x 322=
13) 787 x 400=
14) 614 x 459=
15) 996 x 191=
16) 912 x 782=
17) 886 x 885=
18) 348 x 532=
19) 312 x 753=
20) 543 x 122=
21) 215 x 735=
22) 534 x 272=
23) 101 x 701=
24) 132 x 707=
25) 905 x 171=
26) 568 x 232=
27) 396 x 970=
28) 931 x 327=
29) 339 x 477=
30) 232 x 724=
31) 396 x 169=
32) 758 x 350=
33) 737 x 377=
34) 684 x 261=
35) 776 x 456=
36) 645 x 854=
37) 421 x 499=
38) 491 x 753=
39) 376 x 572=
40) 444 x 562=
41) 331 x 345=
42) 782 x 633=
43) 386 x 804=
44) 119 x 927=
45) 334 x 557=
46) 803 x 924=
47) 867 x 713=
48) 645 x 413=
49) 998 x 977=
50) 384 x 531=




Answers

1) 293 * 519 = 152067 2) 282 * 610 = 172020 3) 750 * 784 = 588000 4) 202 * 379 = 76558 5) 442 * 730 = 322660 6) 401 * 250 = 100250 7) 798 * 413 = 329574 8) 822 * 736 = 604992 9) 242 * 187 = 45254 10) 104 * 982 = 102128 11) 869 * 849 = 737781 12) 934 * 322 = 300748 13) 787 * 400 = 314800 14) 614 * 459 = 281826 15) 996 * 191 = 190236 16) 912 * 782 = 713184 17) 886 * 885 = 784110 18) 348 * 532 = 185136 19) 312 * 753 = 234936 20) 543 * 122 = 66246 21) 215 * 735 = 158025 22) 534 * 272 = 145248 23) 101 * 701 = 70801 24) 132 * 707 = 93324 25) 905 * 171 = 154755 26) 568 * 232 = 131776 27) 396 * 970 = 384120 28) 931 * 327 = 304437 29) 339 * 477 = 161703 30) 232 * 724 = 167968 31) 396 * 169 = 66924 32) 758 * 350 = 265300 33) 737 * 377 = 277849 34) 684 * 261 = 178524 35) 776 * 456 = 353856 36) 645 * 854 = 550830 37) 421 * 499 = 210079 38) 491 * 753 = 369723 39) 376 * 572 = 215072 40) 444 * 562 = 249528 41) 331 * 345 = 114195 42) 782 * 633 = 495006 43) 386 * 804 = 310344 44) 119 * 927 = 110313 45) 334 * 557 = 186038 46) 803 * 924 = 741972 47) 867 * 713 = 618171 48) 645 * 413 = 266385 49) 998 * 977 = 975046 50) 384 * 531 = 203904

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 110

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 110