1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 12

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 12

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 12, 2020.

Questions

1) 526 x 983=
2) 325 x 220=
3) 861 x 960=
4) 521 x 116=
5) 492 x 212=
6) 766 x 786=
7) 682 x 814=
8) 403 x 869=
9) 542 x 569=
10) 383 x 231=
11) 508 x 353=
12) 431 x 862=
13) 859 x 926=
14) 964 x 756=
15) 121 x 809=
16) 380 x 503=
17) 383 x 916=
18) 742 x 506=
19) 584 x 833=
20) 310 x 936=
21) 735 x 919=
22) 849 x 264=
23) 317 x 220=
24) 809 x 661=
25) 203 x 932=
26) 796 x 492=
27) 816 x 779=
28) 411 x 874=
29) 384 x 439=
30) 603 x 213=
31) 928 x 99=
32) 100 x 113=
33) 124 x 677=
34) 894 x 967=
35) 770 x 231=
36) 683 x 295=
37) 706 x 198=
38) 717 x 369=
39) 654 x 520=
40) 349 x 355=
41) 416 x 933=
42) 806 x 146=
43) 643 x 531=
44) 819 x 214=
45) 145 x 322=
46) 621 x 560=
47) 931 x 822=
48) 775 x 160=
49) 968 x 618=
50) 372 x 642=




Answers

1) 526 * 983 = 517058 2) 325 * 220 = 71500 3) 861 * 960 = 826560 4) 521 * 116 = 60436 5) 492 * 212 = 104304 6) 766 * 786 = 602076 7) 682 * 814 = 555148 8) 403 * 869 = 350207 9) 542 * 569 = 308398 10) 383 * 231 = 88473 11) 508 * 353 = 179324 12) 431 * 862 = 371522 13) 859 * 926 = 795434 14) 964 * 756 = 728784 15) 121 * 809 = 97889 16) 380 * 503 = 191140 17) 383 * 916 = 350828 18) 742 * 506 = 375452 19) 584 * 833 = 486472 20) 310 * 936 = 290160 21) 735 * 919 = 675465 22) 849 * 264 = 224136 23) 317 * 220 = 69740 24) 809 * 661 = 534749 25) 203 * 932 = 189196 26) 796 * 492 = 391632 27) 816 * 779 = 635664 28) 411 * 874 = 359214 29) 384 * 439 = 168576 30) 603 * 213 = 128439 31) 928 * 99 = 91872 32) 100 * 113 = 11300 33) 124 * 677 = 83948 34) 894 * 967 = 864498 35) 770 * 231 = 177870 36) 683 * 295 = 201485 37) 706 * 198 = 139788 38) 717 * 369 = 264573 39) 654 * 520 = 340080 40) 349 * 355 = 123895 41) 416 * 933 = 388128 42) 806 * 146 = 117676 43) 643 * 531 = 341433 44) 819 * 214 = 175266 45) 145 * 322 = 46690 46) 621 * 560 = 347760 47) 931 * 822 = 765282 48) 775 * 160 = 124000 49) 968 * 618 = 598224 50) 372 * 642 = 238824

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 12

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 12