1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 13

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 13

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on September 13, 2020.

Questions

1) 475 x 353=
2) 459 x 794=
3) 147 x 846=
4) 822 x 144=
5) 944 x 879=
6) 293 x 567=
7) 753 x 462=
8) 418 x 105=
9) 673 x 296=
10) 190 x 381=
11) 906 x 779=
12) 217 x 233=
13) 455 x 422=
14) 452 x 844=
15) 224 x 543=
16) 710 x 228=
17) 399 x 174=
18) 738 x 871=
19) 395 x 214=
20) 466 x 99=
21) 193 x 501=
22) 877 x 460=
23) 484 x 140=
24) 689 x 171=
25) 179 x 716=
26) 968 x 882=
27) 938 x 723=
28) 143 x 944=
29) 336 x 885=
30) 408 x 224=
31) 938 x 345=
32) 451 x 722=
33) 164 x 608=
34) 155 x 407=
35) 831 x 772=
36) 808 x 105=
37) 996 x 238=
38) 108 x 567=
39) 467 x 393=
40) 848 x 866=
41) 183 x 827=
42) 741 x 393=
43) 441 x 915=
44) 834 x 506=
45) 167 x 965=
46) 811 x 714=
47) 283 x 383=
48) 990 x 899=
49) 693 x 925=
50) 916 x 937=




Answers

1) 475 * 353 = 167675 2) 459 * 794 = 364446 3) 147 * 846 = 124362 4) 822 * 144 = 118368 5) 944 * 879 = 829776 6) 293 * 567 = 166131 7) 753 * 462 = 347886 8) 418 * 105 = 43890 9) 673 * 296 = 199208 10) 190 * 381 = 72390 11) 906 * 779 = 705774 12) 217 * 233 = 50561 13) 455 * 422 = 192010 14) 452 * 844 = 381488 15) 224 * 543 = 121632 16) 710 * 228 = 161880 17) 399 * 174 = 69426 18) 738 * 871 = 642798 19) 395 * 214 = 84530 20) 466 * 99 = 46134 21) 193 * 501 = 96693 22) 877 * 460 = 403420 23) 484 * 140 = 67760 24) 689 * 171 = 117819 25) 179 * 716 = 128164 26) 968 * 882 = 853776 27) 938 * 723 = 678174 28) 143 * 944 = 134992 29) 336 * 885 = 297360 30) 408 * 224 = 91392 31) 938 * 345 = 323610 32) 451 * 722 = 325622 33) 164 * 608 = 99712 34) 155 * 407 = 63085 35) 831 * 772 = 641532 36) 808 * 105 = 84840 37) 996 * 238 = 237048 38) 108 * 567 = 61236 39) 467 * 393 = 183531 40) 848 * 866 = 734368 41) 183 * 827 = 151341 42) 741 * 393 = 291213 43) 441 * 915 = 403515 44) 834 * 506 = 422004 45) 167 * 965 = 161155 46) 811 * 714 = 579054 47) 283 * 383 = 108389 48) 990 * 899 = 890010 49) 693 * 925 = 641025 50) 916 * 937 = 858292

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 13

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 13