1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 14

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 14

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 14, 2020.

Questions

1) 792 x 138=
2) 451 x 129=
3) 509 x 568=
4) 160 x 633=
5) 144 x 393=
6) 733 x 404=
7) 721 x 260=
8) 619 x 186=
9) 529 x 140=
10) 849 x 729=
11) 448 x 397=
12) 817 x 670=
13) 112 x 299=
14) 987 x 974=
15) 340 x 835=
16) 561 x 626=
17) 625 x 765=
18) 865 x 609=
19) 301 x 655=
20) 395 x 532=
21) 556 x 685=
22) 673 x 186=
23) 761 x 530=
24) 215 x 936=
25) 113 x 143=
26) 642 x 281=
27) 681 x 421=
28) 874 x 880=
29) 669 x 181=
30) 905 x 549=
31) 474 x 977=
32) 294 x 545=
33) 757 x 726=
34) 732 x 214=
35) 844 x 620=
36) 164 x 499=
37) 763 x 430=
38) 281 x 376=
39) 502 x 843=
40) 553 x 839=
41) 949 x 469=
42) 663 x 315=
43) 863 x 928=
44) 268 x 887=
45) 946 x 251=
46) 823 x 461=
47) 830 x 259=
48) 983 x 167=
49) 736 x 188=
50) 126 x 487=




Answers

1) 792 * 138 = 109296 2) 451 * 129 = 58179 3) 509 * 568 = 289112 4) 160 * 633 = 101280 5) 144 * 393 = 56592 6) 733 * 404 = 296132 7) 721 * 260 = 187460 8) 619 * 186 = 115134 9) 529 * 140 = 74060 10) 849 * 729 = 618921 11) 448 * 397 = 177856 12) 817 * 670 = 547390 13) 112 * 299 = 33488 14) 987 * 974 = 961338 15) 340 * 835 = 283900 16) 561 * 626 = 351186 17) 625 * 765 = 478125 18) 865 * 609 = 526785 19) 301 * 655 = 197155 20) 395 * 532 = 210140 21) 556 * 685 = 380860 22) 673 * 186 = 125178 23) 761 * 530 = 403330 24) 215 * 936 = 201240 25) 113 * 143 = 16159 26) 642 * 281 = 180402 27) 681 * 421 = 286701 28) 874 * 880 = 769120 29) 669 * 181 = 121089 30) 905 * 549 = 496845 31) 474 * 977 = 463098 32) 294 * 545 = 160230 33) 757 * 726 = 549582 34) 732 * 214 = 156648 35) 844 * 620 = 523280 36) 164 * 499 = 81836 37) 763 * 430 = 328090 38) 281 * 376 = 105656 39) 502 * 843 = 423186 40) 553 * 839 = 463967 41) 949 * 469 = 445081 42) 663 * 315 = 208845 43) 863 * 928 = 800864 44) 268 * 887 = 237716 45) 946 * 251 = 237446 46) 823 * 461 = 379403 47) 830 * 259 = 214970 48) 983 * 167 = 164161 49) 736 * 188 = 138368 50) 126 * 487 = 61362

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 14

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 14