1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 15

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 15

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on September 15, 2020.

Questions

1) 754 x 398=
2) 563 x 200=
3) 796 x 788=
4) 942 x 322=
5) 692 x 256=
6) 498 x 986=
7) 388 x 140=
8) 325 x 559=
9) 424 x 542=
10) 318 x 436=
11) 308 x 564=
12) 150 x 706=
13) 396 x 455=
14) 609 x 647=
15) 428 x 641=
16) 805 x 487=
17) 355 x 258=
18) 560 x 569=
19) 843 x 496=
20) 661 x 459=
21) 889 x 344=
22) 421 x 423=
23) 751 x 845=
24) 752 x 403=
25) 471 x 187=
26) 430 x 194=
27) 357 x 193=
28) 577 x 379=
29) 250 x 608=
30) 881 x 532=
31) 699 x 416=
32) 874 x 878=
33) 309 x 641=
34) 166 x 940=
35) 304 x 216=
36) 258 x 781=
37) 791 x 378=
38) 317 x 536=
39) 850 x 730=
40) 173 x 536=
41) 650 x 145=
42) 802 x 512=
43) 945 x 129=
44) 464 x 227=
45) 484 x 777=
46) 859 x 294=
47) 103 x 235=
48) 350 x 938=
49) 465 x 624=
50) 744 x 711=




Answers

1) 754 * 398 = 300092 2) 563 * 200 = 112600 3) 796 * 788 = 627248 4) 942 * 322 = 303324 5) 692 * 256 = 177152 6) 498 * 986 = 491028 7) 388 * 140 = 54320 8) 325 * 559 = 181675 9) 424 * 542 = 229808 10) 318 * 436 = 138648 11) 308 * 564 = 173712 12) 150 * 706 = 105900 13) 396 * 455 = 180180 14) 609 * 647 = 394023 15) 428 * 641 = 274348 16) 805 * 487 = 392035 17) 355 * 258 = 91590 18) 560 * 569 = 318640 19) 843 * 496 = 418128 20) 661 * 459 = 303399 21) 889 * 344 = 305816 22) 421 * 423 = 178083 23) 751 * 845 = 634595 24) 752 * 403 = 303056 25) 471 * 187 = 88077 26) 430 * 194 = 83420 27) 357 * 193 = 68901 28) 577 * 379 = 218683 29) 250 * 608 = 152000 30) 881 * 532 = 468692 31) 699 * 416 = 290784 32) 874 * 878 = 767372 33) 309 * 641 = 198069 34) 166 * 940 = 156040 35) 304 * 216 = 65664 36) 258 * 781 = 201498 37) 791 * 378 = 298998 38) 317 * 536 = 169912 39) 850 * 730 = 620500 40) 173 * 536 = 92728 41) 650 * 145 = 94250 42) 802 * 512 = 410624 43) 945 * 129 = 121905 44) 464 * 227 = 105328 45) 484 * 777 = 376068 46) 859 * 294 = 252546 47) 103 * 235 = 24205 48) 350 * 938 = 328300 49) 465 * 624 = 290160 50) 744 * 711 = 528984

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 15

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 15