1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 16

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 16

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on September 16, 2020.

Questions

1) 292 x 746=
2) 334 x 568=
3) 170 x 741=
4) 747 x 157=
5) 762 x 685=
6) 349 x 860=
7) 247 x 700=
8) 390 x 324=
9) 543 x 224=
10) 556 x 790=
11) 823 x 571=
12) 570 x 161=
13) 393 x 772=
14) 517 x 731=
15) 804 x 776=
16) 111 x 830=
17) 593 x 298=
18) 399 x 951=
19) 684 x 956=
20) 610 x 768=
21) 183 x 668=
22) 520 x 262=
23) 559 x 563=
24) 565 x 398=
25) 605 x 308=
26) 158 x 401=
27) 539 x 804=
28) 702 x 473=
29) 538 x 328=
30) 703 x 551=
31) 543 x 497=
32) 435 x 307=
33) 776 x 885=
34) 549 x 999=
35) 169 x 165=
36) 446 x 348=
37) 137 x 656=
38) 293 x 426=
39) 550 x 547=
40) 848 x 957=
41) 495 x 105=
42) 433 x 998=
43) 170 x 230=
44) 665 x 722=
45) 627 x 599=
46) 641 x 717=
47) 516 x 894=
48) 686 x 127=
49) 876 x 872=
50) 632 x 395=




Answers

1) 292 * 746 = 217832 2) 334 * 568 = 189712 3) 170 * 741 = 125970 4) 747 * 157 = 117279 5) 762 * 685 = 521970 6) 349 * 860 = 300140 7) 247 * 700 = 172900 8) 390 * 324 = 126360 9) 543 * 224 = 121632 10) 556 * 790 = 439240 11) 823 * 571 = 469933 12) 570 * 161 = 91770 13) 393 * 772 = 303396 14) 517 * 731 = 377927 15) 804 * 776 = 623904 16) 111 * 830 = 92130 17) 593 * 298 = 176714 18) 399 * 951 = 379449 19) 684 * 956 = 653904 20) 610 * 768 = 468480 21) 183 * 668 = 122244 22) 520 * 262 = 136240 23) 559 * 563 = 314717 24) 565 * 398 = 224870 25) 605 * 308 = 186340 26) 158 * 401 = 63358 27) 539 * 804 = 433356 28) 702 * 473 = 332046 29) 538 * 328 = 176464 30) 703 * 551 = 387353 31) 543 * 497 = 269871 32) 435 * 307 = 133545 33) 776 * 885 = 686760 34) 549 * 999 = 548451 35) 169 * 165 = 27885 36) 446 * 348 = 155208 37) 137 * 656 = 89872 38) 293 * 426 = 124818 39) 550 * 547 = 300850 40) 848 * 957 = 811536 41) 495 * 105 = 51975 42) 433 * 998 = 432134 43) 170 * 230 = 39100 44) 665 * 722 = 480130 45) 627 * 599 = 375573 46) 641 * 717 = 459597 47) 516 * 894 = 461304 48) 686 * 127 = 87122 49) 876 * 872 = 763872 50) 632 * 395 = 249640

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 16

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 16