1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 17

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 17

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on September 17, 2020.

Questions

1) 129 x 119=
2) 956 x 205=
3) 264 x 647=
4) 336 x 872=
5) 804 x 413=
6) 224 x 389=
7) 148 x 593=
8) 468 x 674=
9) 310 x 614=
10) 195 x 255=
11) 335 x 717=
12) 161 x 795=
13) 297 x 185=
14) 561 x 715=
15) 310 x 856=
16) 563 x 114=
17) 529 x 483=
18) 743 x 711=
19) 561 x 847=
20) 389 x 236=
21) 949 x 177=
22) 118 x 390=
23) 793 x 572=
24) 902 x 497=
25) 560 x 585=
26) 731 x 534=
27) 378 x 663=
28) 794 x 890=
29) 826 x 344=
30) 615 x 683=
31) 586 x 218=
32) 177 x 410=
33) 509 x 741=
34) 897 x 945=
35) 624 x 746=
36) 595 x 242=
37) 308 x 846=
38) 759 x 483=
39) 293 x 369=
40) 471 x 234=
41) 416 x 570=
42) 736 x 212=
43) 982 x 660=
44) 721 x 740=
45) 593 x 817=
46) 897 x 314=
47) 361 x 718=
48) 311 x 529=
49) 961 x 259=
50) 758 x 303=




Answers

1) 129 * 119 = 15351 2) 956 * 205 = 195980 3) 264 * 647 = 170808 4) 336 * 872 = 292992 5) 804 * 413 = 332052 6) 224 * 389 = 87136 7) 148 * 593 = 87764 8) 468 * 674 = 315432 9) 310 * 614 = 190340 10) 195 * 255 = 49725 11) 335 * 717 = 240195 12) 161 * 795 = 127995 13) 297 * 185 = 54945 14) 561 * 715 = 401115 15) 310 * 856 = 265360 16) 563 * 114 = 64182 17) 529 * 483 = 255507 18) 743 * 711 = 528273 19) 561 * 847 = 475167 20) 389 * 236 = 91804 21) 949 * 177 = 167973 22) 118 * 390 = 46020 23) 793 * 572 = 453596 24) 902 * 497 = 448294 25) 560 * 585 = 327600 26) 731 * 534 = 390354 27) 378 * 663 = 250614 28) 794 * 890 = 706660 29) 826 * 344 = 284144 30) 615 * 683 = 420045 31) 586 * 218 = 127748 32) 177 * 410 = 72570 33) 509 * 741 = 377169 34) 897 * 945 = 847665 35) 624 * 746 = 465504 36) 595 * 242 = 143990 37) 308 * 846 = 260568 38) 759 * 483 = 366597 39) 293 * 369 = 108117 40) 471 * 234 = 110214 41) 416 * 570 = 237120 42) 736 * 212 = 156032 43) 982 * 660 = 648120 44) 721 * 740 = 533540 45) 593 * 817 = 484481 46) 897 * 314 = 281658 47) 361 * 718 = 259198 48) 311 * 529 = 164519 49) 961 * 259 = 248899 50) 758 * 303 = 229674

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 17

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 17