1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 18

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 18

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 18, 2020.

Questions

1) 587 x 968=
2) 503 x 243=
3) 758 x 315=
4) 827 x 876=
5) 557 x 812=
6) 623 x 261=
7) 421 x 746=
8) 447 x 618=
9) 243 x 746=
10) 764 x 363=
11) 707 x 417=
12) 130 x 538=
13) 335 x 851=
14) 645 x 665=
15) 889 x 153=
16) 422 x 900=
17) 523 x 713=
18) 826 x 973=
19) 750 x 169=
20) 582 x 957=
21) 553 x 339=
22) 856 x 517=
23) 429 x 312=
24) 903 x 610=
25) 284 x 109=
26) 937 x 683=
27) 748 x 433=
28) 159 x 578=
29) 262 x 389=
30) 855 x 851=
31) 274 x 500=
32) 525 x 484=
33) 165 x 802=
34) 496 x 633=
35) 534 x 128=
36) 575 x 510=
37) 289 x 345=
38) 350 x 506=
39) 570 x 342=
40) 690 x 273=
41) 365 x 924=
42) 616 x 866=
43) 890 x 368=
44) 813 x 868=
45) 460 x 830=
46) 399 x 990=
47) 610 x 686=
48) 905 x 214=
49) 529 x 227=
50) 620 x 588=




Answers

1) 587 * 968 = 568216 2) 503 * 243 = 122229 3) 758 * 315 = 238770 4) 827 * 876 = 724452 5) 557 * 812 = 452284 6) 623 * 261 = 162603 7) 421 * 746 = 314066 8) 447 * 618 = 276246 9) 243 * 746 = 181278 10) 764 * 363 = 277332 11) 707 * 417 = 294819 12) 130 * 538 = 69940 13) 335 * 851 = 285085 14) 645 * 665 = 428925 15) 889 * 153 = 136017 16) 422 * 900 = 379800 17) 523 * 713 = 372899 18) 826 * 973 = 803698 19) 750 * 169 = 126750 20) 582 * 957 = 556974 21) 553 * 339 = 187467 22) 856 * 517 = 442552 23) 429 * 312 = 133848 24) 903 * 610 = 550830 25) 284 * 109 = 30956 26) 937 * 683 = 639971 27) 748 * 433 = 323884 28) 159 * 578 = 91902 29) 262 * 389 = 101918 30) 855 * 851 = 727605 31) 274 * 500 = 137000 32) 525 * 484 = 254100 33) 165 * 802 = 132330 34) 496 * 633 = 313968 35) 534 * 128 = 68352 36) 575 * 510 = 293250 37) 289 * 345 = 99705 38) 350 * 506 = 177100 39) 570 * 342 = 194940 40) 690 * 273 = 188370 41) 365 * 924 = 337260 42) 616 * 866 = 533456 43) 890 * 368 = 327520 44) 813 * 868 = 705684 45) 460 * 830 = 381800 46) 399 * 990 = 395010 47) 610 * 686 = 418460 48) 905 * 214 = 193670 49) 529 * 227 = 120083 50) 620 * 588 = 364560

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 18

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 18