1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 19

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 19

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 19, 2020.

Questions

1) 996 x 795=
2) 159 x 709=
3) 821 x 812=
4) 789 x 670=
5) 474 x 740=
6) 161 x 321=
7) 176 x 352=
8) 733 x 811=
9) 489 x 117=
10) 408 x 952=
11) 961 x 275=
12) 541 x 589=
13) 397 x 427=
14) 616 x 263=
15) 598 x 794=
16) 215 x 227=
17) 690 x 354=
18) 944 x 191=
19) 195 x 691=
20) 765 x 160=
21) 466 x 563=
22) 232 x 751=
23) 322 x 695=
24) 531 x 609=
25) 173 x 992=
26) 653 x 857=
27) 852 x 617=
28) 202 x 180=
29) 167 x 587=
30) 947 x 969=
31) 781 x 939=
32) 268 x 688=
33) 932 x 780=
34) 267 x 395=
35) 945 x 889=
36) 883 x 880=
37) 854 x 846=
38) 813 x 506=
39) 665 x 696=
40) 259 x 100=
41) 380 x 707=
42) 805 x 642=
43) 149 x 918=
44) 938 x 478=
45) 407 x 639=
46) 836 x 534=
47) 605 x 198=
48) 973 x 776=
49) 540 x 745=
50) 535 x 130=




Answers

1) 996 * 795 = 791820 2) 159 * 709 = 112731 3) 821 * 812 = 666652 4) 789 * 670 = 528630 5) 474 * 740 = 350760 6) 161 * 321 = 51681 7) 176 * 352 = 61952 8) 733 * 811 = 594463 9) 489 * 117 = 57213 10) 408 * 952 = 388416 11) 961 * 275 = 264275 12) 541 * 589 = 318649 13) 397 * 427 = 169519 14) 616 * 263 = 162008 15) 598 * 794 = 474812 16) 215 * 227 = 48805 17) 690 * 354 = 244260 18) 944 * 191 = 180304 19) 195 * 691 = 134745 20) 765 * 160 = 122400 21) 466 * 563 = 262358 22) 232 * 751 = 174232 23) 322 * 695 = 223790 24) 531 * 609 = 323379 25) 173 * 992 = 171616 26) 653 * 857 = 559621 27) 852 * 617 = 525684 28) 202 * 180 = 36360 29) 167 * 587 = 98029 30) 947 * 969 = 917643 31) 781 * 939 = 733359 32) 268 * 688 = 184384 33) 932 * 780 = 726960 34) 267 * 395 = 105465 35) 945 * 889 = 840105 36) 883 * 880 = 777040 37) 854 * 846 = 722484 38) 813 * 506 = 411378 39) 665 * 696 = 462840 40) 259 * 100 = 25900 41) 380 * 707 = 268660 42) 805 * 642 = 516810 43) 149 * 918 = 136782 44) 938 * 478 = 448364 45) 407 * 639 = 260073 46) 836 * 534 = 446424 47) 605 * 198 = 119790 48) 973 * 776 = 755048 49) 540 * 745 = 402300 50) 535 * 130 = 69550

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 19

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 19