1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 2

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 2

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on September 2, 2020.

Questions

1) 868 x 617=
2) 200 x 725=
3) 602 x 142=
4) 416 x 557=
5) 597 x 852=
6) 650 x 234=
7) 698 x 666=
8) 361 x 606=
9) 934 x 488=
10) 511 x 890=
11) 212 x 354=
12) 580 x 583=
13) 138 x 193=
14) 976 x 422=
15) 611 x 748=
16) 344 x 829=
17) 231 x 937=
18) 393 x 899=
19) 390 x 893=
20) 137 x 118=
21) 477 x 173=
22) 137 x 109=
23) 705 x 187=
24) 370 x 819=
25) 878 x 408=
26) 373 x 866=
27) 751 x 553=
28) 535 x 752=
29) 954 x 599=
30) 982 x 788=
31) 287 x 563=
32) 268 x 845=
33) 237 x 985=
34) 827 x 755=
35) 350 x 435=
36) 744 x 498=
37) 677 x 467=
38) 237 x 956=
39) 625 x 840=
40) 684 x 938=
41) 260 x 940=
42) 171 x 615=
43) 530 x 307=
44) 817 x 728=
45) 109 x 770=
46) 219 x 481=
47) 182 x 945=
48) 329 x 664=
49) 815 x 550=
50) 580 x 426=




Answers

1) 868 * 617 = 535556 2) 200 * 725 = 145000 3) 602 * 142 = 85484 4) 416 * 557 = 231712 5) 597 * 852 = 508644 6) 650 * 234 = 152100 7) 698 * 666 = 464868 8) 361 * 606 = 218766 9) 934 * 488 = 455792 10) 511 * 890 = 454790 11) 212 * 354 = 75048 12) 580 * 583 = 338140 13) 138 * 193 = 26634 14) 976 * 422 = 411872 15) 611 * 748 = 457028 16) 344 * 829 = 285176 17) 231 * 937 = 216447 18) 393 * 899 = 353307 19) 390 * 893 = 348270 20) 137 * 118 = 16166 21) 477 * 173 = 82521 22) 137 * 109 = 14933 23) 705 * 187 = 131835 24) 370 * 819 = 303030 25) 878 * 408 = 358224 26) 373 * 866 = 323018 27) 751 * 553 = 415303 28) 535 * 752 = 402320 29) 954 * 599 = 571446 30) 982 * 788 = 773816 31) 287 * 563 = 161581 32) 268 * 845 = 226460 33) 237 * 985 = 233445 34) 827 * 755 = 624385 35) 350 * 435 = 152250 36) 744 * 498 = 370512 37) 677 * 467 = 316159 38) 237 * 956 = 226572 39) 625 * 840 = 525000 40) 684 * 938 = 641592 41) 260 * 940 = 244400 42) 171 * 615 = 105165 43) 530 * 307 = 162710 44) 817 * 728 = 594776 45) 109 * 770 = 83930 46) 219 * 481 = 105339 47) 182 * 945 = 171990 48) 329 * 664 = 218456 49) 815 * 550 = 448250 50) 580 * 426 = 247080

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 2

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 2