1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 20

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 20

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 20, 2020.

Questions

1) 875 x 664=
2) 522 x 482=
3) 376 x 618=
4) 434 x 189=
5) 678 x 660=
6) 768 x 386=
7) 761 x 423=
8) 114 x 474=
9) 217 x 650=
10) 275 x 517=
11) 846 x 369=
12) 621 x 126=
13) 184 x 803=
14) 531 x 690=
15) 533 x 838=
16) 686 x 805=
17) 671 x 936=
18) 122 x 661=
19) 161 x 502=
20) 177 x 532=
21) 422 x 943=
22) 439 x 866=
23) 146 x 440=
24) 726 x 359=
25) 828 x 858=
26) 649 x 968=
27) 878 x 196=
28) 282 x 852=
29) 271 x 437=
30) 711 x 249=
31) 641 x 892=
32) 787 x 343=
33) 692 x 905=
34) 588 x 476=
35) 634 x 355=
36) 596 x 191=
37) 395 x 685=
38) 564 x 885=
39) 499 x 118=
40) 990 x 774=
41) 251 x 941=
42) 455 x 862=
43) 136 x 114=
44) 448 x 735=
45) 739 x 138=
46) 473 x 641=
47) 309 x 888=
48) 864 x 957=
49) 526 x 303=
50) 513 x 157=




Answers

1) 875 * 664 = 581000 2) 522 * 482 = 251604 3) 376 * 618 = 232368 4) 434 * 189 = 82026 5) 678 * 660 = 447480 6) 768 * 386 = 296448 7) 761 * 423 = 321903 8) 114 * 474 = 54036 9) 217 * 650 = 141050 10) 275 * 517 = 142175 11) 846 * 369 = 312174 12) 621 * 126 = 78246 13) 184 * 803 = 147752 14) 531 * 690 = 366390 15) 533 * 838 = 446654 16) 686 * 805 = 552230 17) 671 * 936 = 628056 18) 122 * 661 = 80642 19) 161 * 502 = 80822 20) 177 * 532 = 94164 21) 422 * 943 = 397946 22) 439 * 866 = 380174 23) 146 * 440 = 64240 24) 726 * 359 = 260634 25) 828 * 858 = 710424 26) 649 * 968 = 628232 27) 878 * 196 = 172088 28) 282 * 852 = 240264 29) 271 * 437 = 118427 30) 711 * 249 = 177039 31) 641 * 892 = 571772 32) 787 * 343 = 269941 33) 692 * 905 = 626260 34) 588 * 476 = 279888 35) 634 * 355 = 225070 36) 596 * 191 = 113836 37) 395 * 685 = 270575 38) 564 * 885 = 499140 39) 499 * 118 = 58882 40) 990 * 774 = 766260 41) 251 * 941 = 236191 42) 455 * 862 = 392210 43) 136 * 114 = 15504 44) 448 * 735 = 329280 45) 739 * 138 = 101982 46) 473 * 641 = 303193 47) 309 * 888 = 274392 48) 864 * 957 = 826848 49) 526 * 303 = 159378 50) 513 * 157 = 80541

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 20

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 20