1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 21

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 21

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 21, 2020.

Questions

1) 999 x 575=
2) 390 x 399=
3) 252 x 412=
4) 899 x 304=
5) 258 x 684=
6) 656 x 871=
7) 742 x 864=
8) 179 x 162=
9) 750 x 799=
10) 999 x 286=
11) 287 x 715=
12) 376 x 976=
13) 995 x 484=
14) 251 x 886=
15) 453 x 989=
16) 998 x 816=
17) 515 x 739=
18) 931 x 969=
19) 437 x 128=
20) 523 x 869=
21) 704 x 359=
22) 814 x 408=
23) 667 x 220=
24) 490 x 873=
25) 237 x 737=
26) 141 x 775=
27) 739 x 180=
28) 267 x 149=
29) 182 x 208=
30) 336 x 583=
31) 921 x 607=
32) 178 x 367=
33) 279 x 896=
34) 397 x 645=
35) 128 x 244=
36) 665 x 810=
37) 996 x 197=
38) 399 x 565=
39) 783 x 702=
40) 610 x 162=
41) 407 x 531=
42) 391 x 541=
43) 483 x 616=
44) 911 x 571=
45) 476 x 818=
46) 699 x 265=
47) 511 x 225=
48) 423 x 541=
49) 927 x 778=
50) 149 x 690=




Answers

1) 999 * 575 = 574425 2) 390 * 399 = 155610 3) 252 * 412 = 103824 4) 899 * 304 = 273296 5) 258 * 684 = 176472 6) 656 * 871 = 571376 7) 742 * 864 = 641088 8) 179 * 162 = 28998 9) 750 * 799 = 599250 10) 999 * 286 = 285714 11) 287 * 715 = 205205 12) 376 * 976 = 366976 13) 995 * 484 = 481580 14) 251 * 886 = 222386 15) 453 * 989 = 448017 16) 998 * 816 = 814368 17) 515 * 739 = 380585 18) 931 * 969 = 902139 19) 437 * 128 = 55936 20) 523 * 869 = 454487 21) 704 * 359 = 252736 22) 814 * 408 = 332112 23) 667 * 220 = 146740 24) 490 * 873 = 427770 25) 237 * 737 = 174669 26) 141 * 775 = 109275 27) 739 * 180 = 133020 28) 267 * 149 = 39783 29) 182 * 208 = 37856 30) 336 * 583 = 195888 31) 921 * 607 = 559047 32) 178 * 367 = 65326 33) 279 * 896 = 249984 34) 397 * 645 = 256065 35) 128 * 244 = 31232 36) 665 * 810 = 538650 37) 996 * 197 = 196212 38) 399 * 565 = 225435 39) 783 * 702 = 549666 40) 610 * 162 = 98820 41) 407 * 531 = 216117 42) 391 * 541 = 211531 43) 483 * 616 = 297528 44) 911 * 571 = 520181 45) 476 * 818 = 389368 46) 699 * 265 = 185235 47) 511 * 225 = 114975 48) 423 * 541 = 228843 49) 927 * 778 = 721206 50) 149 * 690 = 102810

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 21

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 21