1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 22

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 22

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on September 22, 2020.

Questions

1) 944 x 380=
2) 107 x 419=
3) 345 x 944=
4) 467 x 669=
5) 651 x 423=
6) 753 x 572=
7) 758 x 357=
8) 634 x 812=
9) 511 x 178=
10) 552 x 700=
11) 571 x 202=
12) 602 x 998=
13) 615 x 796=
14) 129 x 158=
15) 351 x 822=
16) 307 x 437=
17) 785 x 597=
18) 746 x 405=
19) 487 x 260=
20) 919 x 754=
21) 800 x 675=
22) 254 x 586=
23) 183 x 137=
24) 283 x 993=
25) 790 x 233=
26) 863 x 446=
27) 773 x 707=
28) 523 x 220=
29) 662 x 999=
30) 915 x 702=
31) 879 x 737=
32) 925 x 563=
33) 669 x 706=
34) 884 x 366=
35) 340 x 907=
36) 590 x 999=
37) 238 x 664=
38) 492 x 281=
39) 134 x 935=
40) 448 x 240=
41) 660 x 393=
42) 453 x 281=
43) 962 x 935=
44) 911 x 524=
45) 729 x 149=
46) 954 x 169=
47) 370 x 851=
48) 972 x 594=
49) 119 x 186=
50) 392 x 999=




Answers

1) 944 * 380 = 358720 2) 107 * 419 = 44833 3) 345 * 944 = 325680 4) 467 * 669 = 312423 5) 651 * 423 = 275373 6) 753 * 572 = 430716 7) 758 * 357 = 270606 8) 634 * 812 = 514808 9) 511 * 178 = 90958 10) 552 * 700 = 386400 11) 571 * 202 = 115342 12) 602 * 998 = 600796 13) 615 * 796 = 489540 14) 129 * 158 = 20382 15) 351 * 822 = 288522 16) 307 * 437 = 134159 17) 785 * 597 = 468645 18) 746 * 405 = 302130 19) 487 * 260 = 126620 20) 919 * 754 = 692926 21) 800 * 675 = 540000 22) 254 * 586 = 148844 23) 183 * 137 = 25071 24) 283 * 993 = 281019 25) 790 * 233 = 184070 26) 863 * 446 = 384898 27) 773 * 707 = 546511 28) 523 * 220 = 115060 29) 662 * 999 = 661338 30) 915 * 702 = 642330 31) 879 * 737 = 647823 32) 925 * 563 = 520775 33) 669 * 706 = 472314 34) 884 * 366 = 323544 35) 340 * 907 = 308380 36) 590 * 999 = 589410 37) 238 * 664 = 158032 38) 492 * 281 = 138252 39) 134 * 935 = 125290 40) 448 * 240 = 107520 41) 660 * 393 = 259380 42) 453 * 281 = 127293 43) 962 * 935 = 899470 44) 911 * 524 = 477364 45) 729 * 149 = 108621 46) 954 * 169 = 161226 47) 370 * 851 = 314870 48) 972 * 594 = 577368 49) 119 * 186 = 22134 50) 392 * 999 = 391608

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 22

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 22