1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 23

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 23

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on September 23, 2020.

Questions

1) 664 x 631=
2) 961 x 479=
3) 192 x 493=
4) 483 x 677=
5) 219 x 738=
6) 763 x 408=
7) 987 x 828=
8) 350 x 136=
9) 318 x 856=
10) 231 x 704=
11) 547 x 966=
12) 395 x 691=
13) 657 x 370=
14) 536 x 395=
15) 554 x 149=
16) 996 x 535=
17) 312 x 694=
18) 819 x 685=
19) 675 x 124=
20) 105 x 693=
21) 394 x 620=
22) 291 x 147=
23) 961 x 895=
24) 631 x 779=
25) 218 x 315=
26) 502 x 222=
27) 140 x 522=
28) 472 x 808=
29) 119 x 595=
30) 635 x 880=
31) 724 x 942=
32) 691 x 260=
33) 781 x 479=
34) 414 x 289=
35) 967 x 338=
36) 187 x 761=
37) 793 x 787=
38) 809 x 451=
39) 270 x 266=
40) 917 x 327=
41) 978 x 948=
42) 238 x 579=
43) 132 x 835=
44) 134 x 502=
45) 454 x 815=
46) 938 x 982=
47) 384 x 512=
48) 235 x 291=
49) 931 x 813=
50) 987 x 120=




Answers

1) 664 * 631 = 418984 2) 961 * 479 = 460319 3) 192 * 493 = 94656 4) 483 * 677 = 326991 5) 219 * 738 = 161622 6) 763 * 408 = 311304 7) 987 * 828 = 817236 8) 350 * 136 = 47600 9) 318 * 856 = 272208 10) 231 * 704 = 162624 11) 547 * 966 = 528402 12) 395 * 691 = 272945 13) 657 * 370 = 243090 14) 536 * 395 = 211720 15) 554 * 149 = 82546 16) 996 * 535 = 532860 17) 312 * 694 = 216528 18) 819 * 685 = 561015 19) 675 * 124 = 83700 20) 105 * 693 = 72765 21) 394 * 620 = 244280 22) 291 * 147 = 42777 23) 961 * 895 = 860095 24) 631 * 779 = 491549 25) 218 * 315 = 68670 26) 502 * 222 = 111444 27) 140 * 522 = 73080 28) 472 * 808 = 381376 29) 119 * 595 = 70805 30) 635 * 880 = 558800 31) 724 * 942 = 682008 32) 691 * 260 = 179660 33) 781 * 479 = 374099 34) 414 * 289 = 119646 35) 967 * 338 = 326846 36) 187 * 761 = 142307 37) 793 * 787 = 624091 38) 809 * 451 = 364859 39) 270 * 266 = 71820 40) 917 * 327 = 299859 41) 978 * 948 = 927144 42) 238 * 579 = 137802 43) 132 * 835 = 110220 44) 134 * 502 = 67268 45) 454 * 815 = 370010 46) 938 * 982 = 921116 47) 384 * 512 = 196608 48) 235 * 291 = 68385 49) 931 * 813 = 756903 50) 987 * 120 = 118440

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 23

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 23