1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 24

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 24

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 24, 2020.

Questions

1) 395 x 338=
2) 567 x 143=
3) 259 x 348=
4) 266 x 542=
5) 485 x 743=
6) 576 x 552=
7) 320 x 147=
8) 915 x 164=
9) 971 x 320=
10) 153 x 797=
11) 111 x 139=
12) 664 x 286=
13) 830 x 856=
14) 708 x 233=
15) 831 x 459=
16) 643 x 567=
17) 217 x 687=
18) 529 x 845=
19) 117 x 951=
20) 725 x 727=
21) 837 x 314=
22) 108 x 970=
23) 741 x 505=
24) 382 x 521=
25) 326 x 426=
26) 160 x 463=
27) 751 x 514=
28) 466 x 458=
29) 204 x 214=
30) 824 x 808=
31) 133 x 596=
32) 358 x 387=
33) 598 x 616=
34) 879 x 640=
35) 125 x 557=
36) 787 x 871=
37) 570 x 893=
38) 335 x 671=
39) 210 x 708=
40) 304 x 509=
41) 975 x 289=
42) 566 x 651=
43) 511 x 737=
44) 818 x 473=
45) 563 x 693=
46) 118 x 200=
47) 644 x 710=
48) 620 x 177=
49) 555 x 520=
50) 389 x 409=




Answers

1) 395 * 338 = 133510 2) 567 * 143 = 81081 3) 259 * 348 = 90132 4) 266 * 542 = 144172 5) 485 * 743 = 360355 6) 576 * 552 = 317952 7) 320 * 147 = 47040 8) 915 * 164 = 150060 9) 971 * 320 = 310720 10) 153 * 797 = 121941 11) 111 * 139 = 15429 12) 664 * 286 = 189904 13) 830 * 856 = 710480 14) 708 * 233 = 164964 15) 831 * 459 = 381429 16) 643 * 567 = 364581 17) 217 * 687 = 149079 18) 529 * 845 = 447005 19) 117 * 951 = 111267 20) 725 * 727 = 527075 21) 837 * 314 = 262818 22) 108 * 970 = 104760 23) 741 * 505 = 374205 24) 382 * 521 = 199022 25) 326 * 426 = 138876 26) 160 * 463 = 74080 27) 751 * 514 = 386014 28) 466 * 458 = 213428 29) 204 * 214 = 43656 30) 824 * 808 = 665792 31) 133 * 596 = 79268 32) 358 * 387 = 138546 33) 598 * 616 = 368368 34) 879 * 640 = 562560 35) 125 * 557 = 69625 36) 787 * 871 = 685477 37) 570 * 893 = 509010 38) 335 * 671 = 224785 39) 210 * 708 = 148680 40) 304 * 509 = 154736 41) 975 * 289 = 281775 42) 566 * 651 = 368466 43) 511 * 737 = 376607 44) 818 * 473 = 386914 45) 563 * 693 = 390159 46) 118 * 200 = 23600 47) 644 * 710 = 457240 48) 620 * 177 = 109740 49) 555 * 520 = 288600 50) 389 * 409 = 159101

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 24

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 24