1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 25

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 25

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 25, 2020.

Questions

1) 745 x 722=
2) 639 x 128=
3) 107 x 420=
4) 213 x 121=
5) 888 x 843=
6) 641 x 782=
7) 313 x 570=
8) 591 x 316=
9) 986 x 567=
10) 782 x 654=
11) 979 x 731=
12) 615 x 536=
13) 699 x 255=
14) 466 x 942=
15) 686 x 378=
16) 526 x 130=
17) 274 x 652=
18) 915 x 771=
19) 199 x 223=
20) 279 x 433=
21) 103 x 971=
22) 265 x 849=
23) 586 x 678=
24) 858 x 253=
25) 743 x 949=
26) 550 x 827=
27) 776 x 326=
28) 765 x 589=
29) 778 x 235=
30) 173 x 367=
31) 496 x 468=
32) 386 x 233=
33) 522 x 640=
34) 348 x 890=
35) 646 x 767=
36) 234 x 740=
37) 762 x 976=
38) 756 x 523=
39) 317 x 587=
40) 880 x 949=
41) 254 x 516=
42) 106 x 499=
43) 274 x 537=
44) 692 x 490=
45) 138 x 807=
46) 675 x 127=
47) 313 x 536=
48) 551 x 619=
49) 749 x 180=
50) 602 x 197=




Answers

1) 745 * 722 = 537890 2) 639 * 128 = 81792 3) 107 * 420 = 44940 4) 213 * 121 = 25773 5) 888 * 843 = 748584 6) 641 * 782 = 501262 7) 313 * 570 = 178410 8) 591 * 316 = 186756 9) 986 * 567 = 559062 10) 782 * 654 = 511428 11) 979 * 731 = 715649 12) 615 * 536 = 329640 13) 699 * 255 = 178245 14) 466 * 942 = 438972 15) 686 * 378 = 259308 16) 526 * 130 = 68380 17) 274 * 652 = 178648 18) 915 * 771 = 705465 19) 199 * 223 = 44377 20) 279 * 433 = 120807 21) 103 * 971 = 100013 22) 265 * 849 = 224985 23) 586 * 678 = 397308 24) 858 * 253 = 217074 25) 743 * 949 = 705107 26) 550 * 827 = 454850 27) 776 * 326 = 252976 28) 765 * 589 = 450585 29) 778 * 235 = 182830 30) 173 * 367 = 63491 31) 496 * 468 = 232128 32) 386 * 233 = 89938 33) 522 * 640 = 334080 34) 348 * 890 = 309720 35) 646 * 767 = 495482 36) 234 * 740 = 173160 37) 762 * 976 = 743712 38) 756 * 523 = 395388 39) 317 * 587 = 186079 40) 880 * 949 = 835120 41) 254 * 516 = 131064 42) 106 * 499 = 52894 43) 274 * 537 = 147138 44) 692 * 490 = 339080 45) 138 * 807 = 111366 46) 675 * 127 = 85725 47) 313 * 536 = 167768 48) 551 * 619 = 341069 49) 749 * 180 = 134820 50) 602 * 197 = 118594

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 25

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 25