1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 26

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 26

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 26, 2020.

Questions

1) 876 x 827=
2) 846 x 898=
3) 926 x 532=
4) 133 x 364=
5) 109 x 325=
6) 247 x 440=
7) 470 x 380=
8) 647 x 552=
9) 198 x 671=
10) 357 x 681=
11) 949 x 964=
12) 252 x 181=
13) 697 x 495=
14) 356 x 697=
15) 124 x 623=
16) 771 x 710=
17) 800 x 905=
18) 712 x 426=
19) 573 x 505=
20) 611 x 651=
21) 478 x 100=
22) 777 x 972=
23) 427 x 688=
24) 980 x 992=
25) 561 x 884=
26) 335 x 106=
27) 177 x 812=
28) 898 x 524=
29) 388 x 236=
30) 555 x 735=
31) 543 x 268=
32) 629 x 880=
33) 173 x 694=
34) 376 x 862=
35) 388 x 954=
36) 382 x 913=
37) 742 x 898=
38) 702 x 825=
39) 971 x 528=
40) 265 x 340=
41) 756 x 596=
42) 896 x 257=
43) 659 x 546=
44) 282 x 996=
45) 688 x 458=
46) 352 x 750=
47) 679 x 658=
48) 379 x 882=
49) 884 x 112=
50) 570 x 786=




Answers

1) 876 * 827 = 724452 2) 846 * 898 = 759708 3) 926 * 532 = 492632 4) 133 * 364 = 48412 5) 109 * 325 = 35425 6) 247 * 440 = 108680 7) 470 * 380 = 178600 8) 647 * 552 = 357144 9) 198 * 671 = 132858 10) 357 * 681 = 243117 11) 949 * 964 = 914836 12) 252 * 181 = 45612 13) 697 * 495 = 345015 14) 356 * 697 = 248132 15) 124 * 623 = 77252 16) 771 * 710 = 547410 17) 800 * 905 = 724000 18) 712 * 426 = 303312 19) 573 * 505 = 289365 20) 611 * 651 = 397761 21) 478 * 100 = 47800 22) 777 * 972 = 755244 23) 427 * 688 = 293776 24) 980 * 992 = 972160 25) 561 * 884 = 495924 26) 335 * 106 = 35510 27) 177 * 812 = 143724 28) 898 * 524 = 470552 29) 388 * 236 = 91568 30) 555 * 735 = 407925 31) 543 * 268 = 145524 32) 629 * 880 = 553520 33) 173 * 694 = 120062 34) 376 * 862 = 324112 35) 388 * 954 = 370152 36) 382 * 913 = 348766 37) 742 * 898 = 666316 38) 702 * 825 = 579150 39) 971 * 528 = 512688 40) 265 * 340 = 90100 41) 756 * 596 = 450576 42) 896 * 257 = 230272 43) 659 * 546 = 359814 44) 282 * 996 = 280872 45) 688 * 458 = 315104 46) 352 * 750 = 264000 47) 679 * 658 = 446782 48) 379 * 882 = 334278 49) 884 * 112 = 99008 50) 570 * 786 = 448020

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 26

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 26