1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 27

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 27

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 27, 2020.

Questions

1) 585 x 390=
2) 111 x 873=
3) 651 x 912=
4) 453 x 278=
5) 175 x 511=
6) 718 x 810=
7) 819 x 393=
8) 820 x 871=
9) 179 x 835=
10) 653 x 187=
11) 145 x 505=
12) 419 x 829=
13) 212 x 911=
14) 506 x 195=
15) 774 x 506=
16) 198 x 456=
17) 128 x 696=
18) 524 x 903=
19) 761 x 122=
20) 253 x 253=
21) 748 x 277=
22) 568 x 616=
23) 780 x 336=
24) 499 x 715=
25) 148 x 882=
26) 332 x 729=
27) 573 x 624=
28) 260 x 169=
29) 413 x 772=
30) 441 x 790=
31) 778 x 980=
32) 609 x 110=
33) 533 x 581=
34) 379 x 151=
35) 522 x 324=
36) 516 x 435=
37) 565 x 910=
38) 857 x 330=
39) 348 x 820=
40) 790 x 907=
41) 418 x 715=
42) 999 x 263=
43) 513 x 412=
44) 615 x 685=
45) 861 x 756=
46) 604 x 830=
47) 309 x 650=
48) 514 x 633=
49) 128 x 154=
50) 679 x 304=




Answers

1) 585 * 390 = 228150 2) 111 * 873 = 96903 3) 651 * 912 = 593712 4) 453 * 278 = 125934 5) 175 * 511 = 89425 6) 718 * 810 = 581580 7) 819 * 393 = 321867 8) 820 * 871 = 714220 9) 179 * 835 = 149465 10) 653 * 187 = 122111 11) 145 * 505 = 73225 12) 419 * 829 = 347351 13) 212 * 911 = 193132 14) 506 * 195 = 98670 15) 774 * 506 = 391644 16) 198 * 456 = 90288 17) 128 * 696 = 89088 18) 524 * 903 = 473172 19) 761 * 122 = 92842 20) 253 * 253 = 64009 21) 748 * 277 = 207196 22) 568 * 616 = 349888 23) 780 * 336 = 262080 24) 499 * 715 = 356785 25) 148 * 882 = 130536 26) 332 * 729 = 242028 27) 573 * 624 = 357552 28) 260 * 169 = 43940 29) 413 * 772 = 318836 30) 441 * 790 = 348390 31) 778 * 980 = 762440 32) 609 * 110 = 66990 33) 533 * 581 = 309673 34) 379 * 151 = 57229 35) 522 * 324 = 169128 36) 516 * 435 = 224460 37) 565 * 910 = 514150 38) 857 * 330 = 282810 39) 348 * 820 = 285360 40) 790 * 907 = 716530 41) 418 * 715 = 298870 42) 999 * 263 = 262737 43) 513 * 412 = 211356 44) 615 * 685 = 421275 45) 861 * 756 = 650916 46) 604 * 830 = 501320 47) 309 * 650 = 200850 48) 514 * 633 = 325362 49) 128 * 154 = 19712 50) 679 * 304 = 206416

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 27

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 27