1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 28

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 28

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on September 28, 2020.

Questions

1) 497 x 118=
2) 531 x 914=
3) 990 x 183=
4) 427 x 939=
5) 373 x 360=
6) 433 x 970=
7) 683 x 886=
8) 530 x 891=
9) 830 x 984=
10) 125 x 530=
11) 513 x 550=
12) 323 x 175=
13) 315 x 514=
14) 564 x 389=
15) 426 x 736=
16) 331 x 984=
17) 231 x 752=
18) 318 x 257=
19) 137 x 208=
20) 290 x 140=
21) 320 x 200=
22) 301 x 218=
23) 173 x 304=
24) 789 x 325=
25) 245 x 743=
26) 442 x 901=
27) 906 x 308=
28) 254 x 624=
29) 510 x 468=
30) 275 x 683=
31) 218 x 846=
32) 152 x 165=
33) 257 x 535=
34) 783 x 264=
35) 909 x 886=
36) 499 x 315=
37) 324 x 475=
38) 423 x 972=
39) 984 x 889=
40) 775 x 452=
41) 419 x 545=
42) 596 x 912=
43) 572 x 608=
44) 172 x 439=
45) 99 x 579=
46) 527 x 105=
47) 685 x 476=
48) 467 x 945=
49) 992 x 848=
50) 494 x 848=




Answers

1) 497 * 118 = 58646 2) 531 * 914 = 485334 3) 990 * 183 = 181170 4) 427 * 939 = 400953 5) 373 * 360 = 134280 6) 433 * 970 = 420010 7) 683 * 886 = 605138 8) 530 * 891 = 472230 9) 830 * 984 = 816720 10) 125 * 530 = 66250 11) 513 * 550 = 282150 12) 323 * 175 = 56525 13) 315 * 514 = 161910 14) 564 * 389 = 219396 15) 426 * 736 = 313536 16) 331 * 984 = 325704 17) 231 * 752 = 173712 18) 318 * 257 = 81726 19) 137 * 208 = 28496 20) 290 * 140 = 40600 21) 320 * 200 = 64000 22) 301 * 218 = 65618 23) 173 * 304 = 52592 24) 789 * 325 = 256425 25) 245 * 743 = 182035 26) 442 * 901 = 398242 27) 906 * 308 = 279048 28) 254 * 624 = 158496 29) 510 * 468 = 238680 30) 275 * 683 = 187825 31) 218 * 846 = 184428 32) 152 * 165 = 25080 33) 257 * 535 = 137495 34) 783 * 264 = 206712 35) 909 * 886 = 805374 36) 499 * 315 = 157185 37) 324 * 475 = 153900 38) 423 * 972 = 411156 39) 984 * 889 = 874776 40) 775 * 452 = 350300 41) 419 * 545 = 228355 42) 596 * 912 = 543552 43) 572 * 608 = 347776 44) 172 * 439 = 75508 45) 99 * 579 = 57321 46) 527 * 105 = 55335 47) 685 * 476 = 326060 48) 467 * 945 = 441315 49) 992 * 848 = 841216 50) 494 * 848 = 418912

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 28

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 28