1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 29

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 29

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on September 29, 2020.

Questions

1) 140 x 728=
2) 132 x 744=
3) 141 x 720=
4) 455 x 102=
5) 241 x 197=
6) 289 x 894=
7) 473 x 483=
8) 769 x 156=
9) 624 x 712=
10) 666 x 394=
11) 393 x 275=
12) 842 x 305=
13) 834 x 687=
14) 703 x 680=
15) 874 x 846=
16) 553 x 169=
17) 120 x 440=
18) 979 x 472=
19) 188 x 883=
20) 671 x 528=
21) 99 x 969=
22) 722 x 508=
23) 515 x 652=
24) 488 x 154=
25) 410 x 731=
26) 784 x 867=
27) 358 x 754=
28) 756 x 536=
29) 303 x 647=
30) 884 x 468=
31) 248 x 367=
32) 725 x 221=
33) 285 x 512=
34) 540 x 949=
35) 502 x 745=
36) 571 x 655=
37) 767 x 171=
38) 970 x 235=
39) 708 x 111=
40) 282 x 749=
41) 645 x 147=
42) 999 x 260=
43) 852 x 848=
44) 835 x 496=
45) 236 x 799=
46) 254 x 698=
47) 171 x 504=
48) 806 x 667=
49) 404 x 297=
50) 378 x 684=




Answers

1) 140 * 728 = 101920 2) 132 * 744 = 98208 3) 141 * 720 = 101520 4) 455 * 102 = 46410 5) 241 * 197 = 47477 6) 289 * 894 = 258366 7) 473 * 483 = 228459 8) 769 * 156 = 119964 9) 624 * 712 = 444288 10) 666 * 394 = 262404 11) 393 * 275 = 108075 12) 842 * 305 = 256810 13) 834 * 687 = 572958 14) 703 * 680 = 478040 15) 874 * 846 = 739404 16) 553 * 169 = 93457 17) 120 * 440 = 52800 18) 979 * 472 = 462088 19) 188 * 883 = 166004 20) 671 * 528 = 354288 21) 99 * 969 = 95931 22) 722 * 508 = 366776 23) 515 * 652 = 335780 24) 488 * 154 = 75152 25) 410 * 731 = 299710 26) 784 * 867 = 679728 27) 358 * 754 = 269932 28) 756 * 536 = 405216 29) 303 * 647 = 196041 30) 884 * 468 = 413712 31) 248 * 367 = 91016 32) 725 * 221 = 160225 33) 285 * 512 = 145920 34) 540 * 949 = 512460 35) 502 * 745 = 373990 36) 571 * 655 = 374005 37) 767 * 171 = 131157 38) 970 * 235 = 227950 39) 708 * 111 = 78588 40) 282 * 749 = 211218 41) 645 * 147 = 94815 42) 999 * 260 = 259740 43) 852 * 848 = 722496 44) 835 * 496 = 414160 45) 236 * 799 = 188564 46) 254 * 698 = 177292 47) 171 * 504 = 86184 48) 806 * 667 = 537602 49) 404 * 297 = 119988 50) 378 * 684 = 258552

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 29

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 29