1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 3

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 3

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on September 3, 2020.

Questions

1) 351 x 212=
2) 100 x 747=
3) 973 x 967=
4) 119 x 599=
5) 808 x 986=
6) 466 x 102=
7) 419 x 624=
8) 338 x 159=
9) 165 x 898=
10) 161 x 467=
11) 951 x 480=
12) 550 x 648=
13) 270 x 824=
14) 562 x 677=
15) 901 x 553=
16) 231 x 237=
17) 805 x 552=
18) 100 x 266=
19) 391 x 380=
20) 741 x 774=
21) 833 x 169=
22) 763 x 711=
23) 345 x 526=
24) 457 x 313=
25) 120 x 818=
26) 949 x 486=
27) 891 x 995=
28) 226 x 196=
29) 460 x 592=
30) 144 x 959=
31) 809 x 449=
32) 199 x 273=
33) 675 x 719=
34) 380 x 734=
35) 546 x 571=
36) 852 x 749=
37) 825 x 815=
38) 737 x 759=
39) 680 x 897=
40) 750 x 254=
41) 757 x 378=
42) 150 x 112=
43) 771 x 411=
44) 228 x 278=
45) 396 x 567=
46) 848 x 173=
47) 244 x 704=
48) 337 x 170=
49) 524 x 472=
50) 258 x 330=




Answers

1) 351 * 212 = 74412 2) 100 * 747 = 74700 3) 973 * 967 = 940891 4) 119 * 599 = 71281 5) 808 * 986 = 796688 6) 466 * 102 = 47532 7) 419 * 624 = 261456 8) 338 * 159 = 53742 9) 165 * 898 = 148170 10) 161 * 467 = 75187 11) 951 * 480 = 456480 12) 550 * 648 = 356400 13) 270 * 824 = 222480 14) 562 * 677 = 380474 15) 901 * 553 = 498253 16) 231 * 237 = 54747 17) 805 * 552 = 444360 18) 100 * 266 = 26600 19) 391 * 380 = 148580 20) 741 * 774 = 573534 21) 833 * 169 = 140777 22) 763 * 711 = 542493 23) 345 * 526 = 181470 24) 457 * 313 = 143041 25) 120 * 818 = 98160 26) 949 * 486 = 461214 27) 891 * 995 = 886545 28) 226 * 196 = 44296 29) 460 * 592 = 272320 30) 144 * 959 = 138096 31) 809 * 449 = 363241 32) 199 * 273 = 54327 33) 675 * 719 = 485325 34) 380 * 734 = 278920 35) 546 * 571 = 311766 36) 852 * 749 = 638148 37) 825 * 815 = 672375 38) 737 * 759 = 559383 39) 680 * 897 = 609960 40) 750 * 254 = 190500 41) 757 * 378 = 286146 42) 150 * 112 = 16800 43) 771 * 411 = 316881 44) 228 * 278 = 63384 45) 396 * 567 = 224532 46) 848 * 173 = 146704 47) 244 * 704 = 171776 48) 337 * 170 = 57290 49) 524 * 472 = 247328 50) 258 * 330 = 85140

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 3

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 3