1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 30

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 30

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 30, 2020.

Questions

1) 890 x 340=
2) 854 x 942=
3) 627 x 807=
4) 852 x 600=
5) 141 x 640=
6) 196 x 240=
7) 332 x 702=
8) 230 x 427=
9) 810 x 696=
10) 962 x 148=
11) 494 x 963=
12) 678 x 646=
13) 772 x 462=
14) 927 x 162=
15) 889 x 386=
16) 543 x 480=
17) 457 x 816=
18) 698 x 321=
19) 250 x 696=
20) 851 x 408=
21) 471 x 852=
22) 137 x 190=
23) 924 x 266=
24) 577 x 454=
25) 419 x 115=
26) 191 x 424=
27) 280 x 518=
28) 175 x 105=
29) 809 x 179=
30) 571 x 216=
31) 590 x 414=
32) 851 x 860=
33) 190 x 518=
34) 920 x 488=
35) 590 x 972=
36) 130 x 482=
37) 733 x 765=
38) 946 x 358=
39) 255 x 121=
40) 269 x 281=
41) 382 x 945=
42) 235 x 626=
43) 206 x 760=
44) 810 x 262=
45) 249 x 127=
46) 196 x 294=
47) 231 x 618=
48) 825 x 558=
49) 483 x 220=
50) 448 x 309=




Answers

1) 890 * 340 = 302600 2) 854 * 942 = 804468 3) 627 * 807 = 505989 4) 852 * 600 = 511200 5) 141 * 640 = 90240 6) 196 * 240 = 47040 7) 332 * 702 = 233064 8) 230 * 427 = 98210 9) 810 * 696 = 563760 10) 962 * 148 = 142376 11) 494 * 963 = 475722 12) 678 * 646 = 437988 13) 772 * 462 = 356664 14) 927 * 162 = 150174 15) 889 * 386 = 343154 16) 543 * 480 = 260640 17) 457 * 816 = 372912 18) 698 * 321 = 224058 19) 250 * 696 = 174000 20) 851 * 408 = 347208 21) 471 * 852 = 401292 22) 137 * 190 = 26030 23) 924 * 266 = 245784 24) 577 * 454 = 261958 25) 419 * 115 = 48185 26) 191 * 424 = 80984 27) 280 * 518 = 145040 28) 175 * 105 = 18375 29) 809 * 179 = 144811 30) 571 * 216 = 123336 31) 590 * 414 = 244260 32) 851 * 860 = 731860 33) 190 * 518 = 98420 34) 920 * 488 = 448960 35) 590 * 972 = 573480 36) 130 * 482 = 62660 37) 733 * 765 = 560745 38) 946 * 358 = 338668 39) 255 * 121 = 30855 40) 269 * 281 = 75589 41) 382 * 945 = 360990 42) 235 * 626 = 147110 43) 206 * 760 = 156560 44) 810 * 262 = 212220 45) 249 * 127 = 31623 46) 196 * 294 = 57624 47) 231 * 618 = 142758 48) 825 * 558 = 460350 49) 483 * 220 = 106260 50) 448 * 309 = 138432

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 30

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 30