1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 31

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 31

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 1, 2020.

Questions

1) 496 x 908=
2) 936 x 793=
3) 740 x 654=
4) 816 x 819=
5) 185 x 668=
6) 305 x 340=
7) 407 x 622=
8) 237 x 301=
9) 374 x 739=
10) 935 x 615=
11) 948 x 418=
12) 793 x 349=
13) 988 x 572=
14) 871 x 291=
15) 599 x 241=
16) 311 x 649=
17) 898 x 748=
18) 446 x 257=
19) 114 x 696=
20) 158 x 604=
21) 968 x 914=
22) 736 x 190=
23) 836 x 312=
24) 848 x 317=
25) 594 x 869=
26) 426 x 133=
27) 180 x 913=
28) 307 x 332=
29) 108 x 972=
30) 386 x 717=
31) 662 x 546=
32) 204 x 103=
33) 711 x 213=
34) 264 x 740=
35) 277 x 566=
36) 459 x 540=
37) 977 x 519=
38) 968 x 320=
39) 184 x 704=
40) 148 x 102=
41) 104 x 732=
42) 705 x 902=
43) 405 x 435=
44) 493 x 115=
45) 419 x 730=
46) 509 x 798=
47) 777 x 222=
48) 207 x 610=
49) 858 x 126=
50) 301 x 482=




Answers

1) 496 * 908 = 450368 2) 936 * 793 = 742248 3) 740 * 654 = 483960 4) 816 * 819 = 668304 5) 185 * 668 = 123580 6) 305 * 340 = 103700 7) 407 * 622 = 253154 8) 237 * 301 = 71337 9) 374 * 739 = 276386 10) 935 * 615 = 575025 11) 948 * 418 = 396264 12) 793 * 349 = 276757 13) 988 * 572 = 565136 14) 871 * 291 = 253461 15) 599 * 241 = 144359 16) 311 * 649 = 201839 17) 898 * 748 = 671704 18) 446 * 257 = 114622 19) 114 * 696 = 79344 20) 158 * 604 = 95432 21) 968 * 914 = 884752 22) 736 * 190 = 139840 23) 836 * 312 = 260832 24) 848 * 317 = 268816 25) 594 * 869 = 516186 26) 426 * 133 = 56658 27) 180 * 913 = 164340 28) 307 * 332 = 101924 29) 108 * 972 = 104976 30) 386 * 717 = 276762 31) 662 * 546 = 361452 32) 204 * 103 = 21012 33) 711 * 213 = 151443 34) 264 * 740 = 195360 35) 277 * 566 = 156782 36) 459 * 540 = 247860 37) 977 * 519 = 507063 38) 968 * 320 = 309760 39) 184 * 704 = 129536 40) 148 * 102 = 15096 41) 104 * 732 = 76128 42) 705 * 902 = 635910 43) 405 * 435 = 176175 44) 493 * 115 = 56695 45) 419 * 730 = 305870 46) 509 * 798 = 406182 47) 777 * 222 = 172494 48) 207 * 610 = 126270 49) 858 * 126 = 108108 50) 301 * 482 = 145082

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 31

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 31