1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 32

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 32

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 2, 2020.

Questions

1) 175 x 113=
2) 276 x 594=
3) 217 x 851=
4) 682 x 462=
5) 755 x 702=
6) 218 x 364=
7) 868 x 795=
8) 504 x 614=
9) 686 x 722=
10) 458 x 792=
11) 381 x 801=
12) 326 x 510=
13) 569 x 239=
14) 789 x 523=
15) 658 x 496=
16) 682 x 578=
17) 350 x 475=
18) 243 x 715=
19) 99 x 253=
20) 312 x 775=
21) 896 x 468=
22) 690 x 253=
23) 130 x 529=
24) 452 x 143=
25) 870 x 118=
26) 183 x 235=
27) 259 x 329=
28) 645 x 107=
29) 780 x 114=
30) 545 x 799=
31) 132 x 849=
32) 981 x 406=
33) 707 x 261=
34) 160 x 198=
35) 186 x 802=
36) 772 x 135=
37) 673 x 565=
38) 141 x 514=
39) 227 x 116=
40) 688 x 399=
41) 383 x 156=
42) 773 x 589=
43) 867 x 856=
44) 487 x 744=
45) 328 x 939=
46) 518 x 515=
47) 669 x 679=
48) 571 x 613=
49) 674 x 399=
50) 376 x 468=




Answers

1) 175 * 113 = 19775 2) 276 * 594 = 163944 3) 217 * 851 = 184667 4) 682 * 462 = 315084 5) 755 * 702 = 530010 6) 218 * 364 = 79352 7) 868 * 795 = 690060 8) 504 * 614 = 309456 9) 686 * 722 = 495292 10) 458 * 792 = 362736 11) 381 * 801 = 305181 12) 326 * 510 = 166260 13) 569 * 239 = 135991 14) 789 * 523 = 412647 15) 658 * 496 = 326368 16) 682 * 578 = 394196 17) 350 * 475 = 166250 18) 243 * 715 = 173745 19) 99 * 253 = 25047 20) 312 * 775 = 241800 21) 896 * 468 = 419328 22) 690 * 253 = 174570 23) 130 * 529 = 68770 24) 452 * 143 = 64636 25) 870 * 118 = 102660 26) 183 * 235 = 43005 27) 259 * 329 = 85211 28) 645 * 107 = 69015 29) 780 * 114 = 88920 30) 545 * 799 = 435455 31) 132 * 849 = 112068 32) 981 * 406 = 398286 33) 707 * 261 = 184527 34) 160 * 198 = 31680 35) 186 * 802 = 149172 36) 772 * 135 = 104220 37) 673 * 565 = 380245 38) 141 * 514 = 72474 39) 227 * 116 = 26332 40) 688 * 399 = 274512 41) 383 * 156 = 59748 42) 773 * 589 = 455297 43) 867 * 856 = 742152 44) 487 * 744 = 362328 45) 328 * 939 = 307992 46) 518 * 515 = 266770 47) 669 * 679 = 454251 48) 571 * 613 = 350023 49) 674 * 399 = 268926 50) 376 * 468 = 175968

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 32

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 32