1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 33

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 33

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 3, 2020.

Questions

1) 959 x 216=
2) 557 x 134=
3) 764 x 743=
4) 605 x 683=
5) 254 x 296=
6) 865 x 890=
7) 959 x 386=
8) 294 x 652=
9) 631 x 363=
10) 341 x 449=
11) 981 x 707=
12) 568 x 632=
13) 267 x 346=
14) 262 x 867=
15) 783 x 546=
16) 182 x 551=
17) 561 x 523=
18) 738 x 801=
19) 293 x 702=
20) 610 x 182=
21) 808 x 583=
22) 691 x 274=
23) 651 x 173=
24) 372 x 442=
25) 410 x 658=
26) 157 x 802=
27) 799 x 838=
28) 184 x 779=
29) 326 x 963=
30) 541 x 377=
31) 236 x 685=
32) 326 x 961=
33) 247 x 936=
34) 744 x 729=
35) 506 x 811=
36) 528 x 940=
37) 465 x 913=
38) 139 x 101=
39) 759 x 506=
40) 791 x 866=
41) 534 x 521=
42) 189 x 527=
43) 808 x 635=
44) 706 x 952=
45) 964 x 952=
46) 351 x 415=
47) 182 x 200=
48) 203 x 392=
49) 807 x 538=
50) 988 x 409=




Answers

1) 959 * 216 = 207144 2) 557 * 134 = 74638 3) 764 * 743 = 567652 4) 605 * 683 = 413215 5) 254 * 296 = 75184 6) 865 * 890 = 769850 7) 959 * 386 = 370174 8) 294 * 652 = 191688 9) 631 * 363 = 229053 10) 341 * 449 = 153109 11) 981 * 707 = 693567 12) 568 * 632 = 358976 13) 267 * 346 = 92382 14) 262 * 867 = 227154 15) 783 * 546 = 427518 16) 182 * 551 = 100282 17) 561 * 523 = 293403 18) 738 * 801 = 591138 19) 293 * 702 = 205686 20) 610 * 182 = 111020 21) 808 * 583 = 471064 22) 691 * 274 = 189334 23) 651 * 173 = 112623 24) 372 * 442 = 164424 25) 410 * 658 = 269780 26) 157 * 802 = 125914 27) 799 * 838 = 669562 28) 184 * 779 = 143336 29) 326 * 963 = 313938 30) 541 * 377 = 203957 31) 236 * 685 = 161660 32) 326 * 961 = 313286 33) 247 * 936 = 231192 34) 744 * 729 = 542376 35) 506 * 811 = 410366 36) 528 * 940 = 496320 37) 465 * 913 = 424545 38) 139 * 101 = 14039 39) 759 * 506 = 384054 40) 791 * 866 = 685006 41) 534 * 521 = 278214 42) 189 * 527 = 99603 43) 808 * 635 = 513080 44) 706 * 952 = 672112 45) 964 * 952 = 917728 46) 351 * 415 = 145665 47) 182 * 200 = 36400 48) 203 * 392 = 79576 49) 807 * 538 = 434166 50) 988 * 409 = 404092

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 33

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 33