1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 34

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 34

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 4, 2020.

Questions

1) 233 x 100=
2) 308 x 559=
3) 663 x 241=
4) 153 x 666=
5) 163 x 652=
6) 769 x 969=
7) 811 x 720=
8) 123 x 390=
9) 648 x 500=
10) 511 x 378=
11) 961 x 706=
12) 494 x 862=
13) 549 x 780=
14) 635 x 112=
15) 674 x 155=
16) 869 x 413=
17) 180 x 279=
18) 195 x 356=
19) 796 x 274=
20) 724 x 294=
21) 713 x 644=
22) 758 x 673=
23) 186 x 471=
24) 137 x 212=
25) 915 x 777=
26) 711 x 689=
27) 501 x 445=
28) 755 x 260=
29) 359 x 990=
30) 406 x 355=
31) 101 x 663=
32) 327 x 188=
33) 211 x 209=
34) 473 x 483=
35) 653 x 135=
36) 890 x 880=
37) 188 x 903=
38) 623 x 912=
39) 950 x 568=
40) 937 x 456=
41) 217 x 239=
42) 466 x 909=
43) 305 x 534=
44) 133 x 171=
45) 796 x 626=
46) 804 x 758=
47) 933 x 549=
48) 655 x 308=
49) 904 x 280=
50) 305 x 827=




Answers

1) 233 * 100 = 23300 2) 308 * 559 = 172172 3) 663 * 241 = 159783 4) 153 * 666 = 101898 5) 163 * 652 = 106276 6) 769 * 969 = 745161 7) 811 * 720 = 583920 8) 123 * 390 = 47970 9) 648 * 500 = 324000 10) 511 * 378 = 193158 11) 961 * 706 = 678466 12) 494 * 862 = 425828 13) 549 * 780 = 428220 14) 635 * 112 = 71120 15) 674 * 155 = 104470 16) 869 * 413 = 358897 17) 180 * 279 = 50220 18) 195 * 356 = 69420 19) 796 * 274 = 218104 20) 724 * 294 = 212856 21) 713 * 644 = 459172 22) 758 * 673 = 510134 23) 186 * 471 = 87606 24) 137 * 212 = 29044 25) 915 * 777 = 710955 26) 711 * 689 = 489879 27) 501 * 445 = 222945 28) 755 * 260 = 196300 29) 359 * 990 = 355410 30) 406 * 355 = 144130 31) 101 * 663 = 66963 32) 327 * 188 = 61476 33) 211 * 209 = 44099 34) 473 * 483 = 228459 35) 653 * 135 = 88155 36) 890 * 880 = 783200 37) 188 * 903 = 169764 38) 623 * 912 = 568176 39) 950 * 568 = 539600 40) 937 * 456 = 427272 41) 217 * 239 = 51863 42) 466 * 909 = 423594 43) 305 * 534 = 162870 44) 133 * 171 = 22743 45) 796 * 626 = 498296 46) 804 * 758 = 609432 47) 933 * 549 = 512217 48) 655 * 308 = 201740 49) 904 * 280 = 253120 50) 305 * 827 = 252235

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 34

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 34