1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 35

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 35

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on October 5, 2020.

Questions

1) 124 x 247=
2) 956 x 328=
3) 493 x 953=
4) 411 x 990=
5) 828 x 704=
6) 936 x 141=
7) 289 x 825=
8) 807 x 931=
9) 853 x 463=
10) 252 x 149=
11) 174 x 644=
12) 332 x 809=
13) 310 x 988=
14) 143 x 560=
15) 356 x 356=
16) 408 x 401=
17) 800 x 501=
18) 332 x 983=
19) 453 x 188=
20) 381 x 339=
21) 725 x 839=
22) 959 x 567=
23) 199 x 478=
24) 547 x 252=
25) 221 x 499=
26) 908 x 746=
27) 314 x 522=
28) 551 x 535=
29) 113 x 514=
30) 921 x 654=
31) 261 x 795=
32) 622 x 417=
33) 885 x 684=
34) 707 x 547=
35) 665 x 485=
36) 668 x 720=
37) 374 x 828=
38) 140 x 418=
39) 770 x 922=
40) 867 x 939=
41) 798 x 197=
42) 689 x 797=
43) 649 x 563=
44) 504 x 298=
45) 843 x 400=
46) 370 x 387=
47) 847 x 719=
48) 990 x 626=
49) 507 x 262=
50) 602 x 165=




Answers

1) 124 * 247 = 30628 2) 956 * 328 = 313568 3) 493 * 953 = 469829 4) 411 * 990 = 406890 5) 828 * 704 = 582912 6) 936 * 141 = 131976 7) 289 * 825 = 238425 8) 807 * 931 = 751317 9) 853 * 463 = 394939 10) 252 * 149 = 37548 11) 174 * 644 = 112056 12) 332 * 809 = 268588 13) 310 * 988 = 306280 14) 143 * 560 = 80080 15) 356 * 356 = 126736 16) 408 * 401 = 163608 17) 800 * 501 = 400800 18) 332 * 983 = 326356 19) 453 * 188 = 85164 20) 381 * 339 = 129159 21) 725 * 839 = 608275 22) 959 * 567 = 543753 23) 199 * 478 = 95122 24) 547 * 252 = 137844 25) 221 * 499 = 110279 26) 908 * 746 = 677368 27) 314 * 522 = 163908 28) 551 * 535 = 294785 29) 113 * 514 = 58082 30) 921 * 654 = 602334 31) 261 * 795 = 207495 32) 622 * 417 = 259374 33) 885 * 684 = 605340 34) 707 * 547 = 386729 35) 665 * 485 = 322525 36) 668 * 720 = 480960 37) 374 * 828 = 309672 38) 140 * 418 = 58520 39) 770 * 922 = 709940 40) 867 * 939 = 814113 41) 798 * 197 = 157206 42) 689 * 797 = 549133 43) 649 * 563 = 365387 44) 504 * 298 = 150192 45) 843 * 400 = 337200 46) 370 * 387 = 143190 47) 847 * 719 = 608993 48) 990 * 626 = 619740 49) 507 * 262 = 132834 50) 602 * 165 = 99330

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 35

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 35