1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 36

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 36

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on October 6, 2020.

Questions

1) 113 x 283=
2) 986 x 903=
3) 368 x 901=
4) 695 x 653=
5) 869 x 170=
6) 673 x 115=
7) 769 x 105=
8) 801 x 234=
9) 759 x 486=
10) 232 x 373=
11) 451 x 794=
12) 996 x 246=
13) 590 x 924=
14) 912 x 110=
15) 653 x 786=
16) 783 x 846=
17) 456 x 863=
18) 436 x 851=
19) 556 x 851=
20) 680 x 106=
21) 878 x 677=
22) 273 x 586=
23) 368 x 235=
24) 584 x 941=
25) 443 x 426=
26) 469 x 832=
27) 619 x 208=
28) 394 x 686=
29) 636 x 659=
30) 685 x 585=
31) 950 x 218=
32) 224 x 434=
33) 622 x 678=
34) 495 x 605=
35) 886 x 229=
36) 560 x 961=
37) 605 x 341=
38) 726 x 265=
39) 955 x 830=
40) 939 x 289=
41) 393 x 473=
42) 240 x 834=
43) 773 x 433=
44) 995 x 685=
45) 394 x 748=
46) 997 x 630=
47) 449 x 268=
48) 415 x 228=
49) 146 x 204=
50) 962 x 925=




Answers

1) 113 * 283 = 31979 2) 986 * 903 = 890358 3) 368 * 901 = 331568 4) 695 * 653 = 453835 5) 869 * 170 = 147730 6) 673 * 115 = 77395 7) 769 * 105 = 80745 8) 801 * 234 = 187434 9) 759 * 486 = 368874 10) 232 * 373 = 86536 11) 451 * 794 = 358094 12) 996 * 246 = 245016 13) 590 * 924 = 545160 14) 912 * 110 = 100320 15) 653 * 786 = 513258 16) 783 * 846 = 662418 17) 456 * 863 = 393528 18) 436 * 851 = 371036 19) 556 * 851 = 473156 20) 680 * 106 = 72080 21) 878 * 677 = 594406 22) 273 * 586 = 159978 23) 368 * 235 = 86480 24) 584 * 941 = 549544 25) 443 * 426 = 188718 26) 469 * 832 = 390208 27) 619 * 208 = 128752 28) 394 * 686 = 270284 29) 636 * 659 = 419124 30) 685 * 585 = 400725 31) 950 * 218 = 207100 32) 224 * 434 = 97216 33) 622 * 678 = 421716 34) 495 * 605 = 299475 35) 886 * 229 = 202894 36) 560 * 961 = 538160 37) 605 * 341 = 206305 38) 726 * 265 = 192390 39) 955 * 830 = 792650 40) 939 * 289 = 271371 41) 393 * 473 = 185889 42) 240 * 834 = 200160 43) 773 * 433 = 334709 44) 995 * 685 = 681575 45) 394 * 748 = 294712 46) 997 * 630 = 628110 47) 449 * 268 = 120332 48) 415 * 228 = 94620 49) 146 * 204 = 29784 50) 962 * 925 = 889850

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 36

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 36