1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 37

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 37

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on October 7, 2020.

Questions

1) 454 x 351=
2) 239 x 501=
3) 631 x 314=
4) 221 x 841=
5) 445 x 547=
6) 936 x 899=
7) 483 x 119=
8) 880 x 449=
9) 791 x 190=
10) 648 x 846=
11) 255 x 728=
12) 207 x 916=
13) 314 x 191=
14) 755 x 939=
15) 362 x 549=
16) 377 x 966=
17) 162 x 198=
18) 960 x 263=
19) 189 x 358=
20) 781 x 519=
21) 245 x 586=
22) 437 x 637=
23) 538 x 850=
24) 998 x 884=
25) 602 x 488=
26) 520 x 895=
27) 830 x 773=
28) 817 x 155=
29) 980 x 302=
30) 577 x 315=
31) 160 x 530=
32) 422 x 356=
33) 790 x 914=
34) 274 x 462=
35) 535 x 954=
36) 229 x 849=
37) 811 x 925=
38) 694 x 960=
39) 337 x 721=
40) 949 x 164=
41) 291 x 420=
42) 909 x 312=
43) 885 x 225=
44) 100 x 851=
45) 206 x 233=
46) 225 x 808=
47) 818 x 531=
48) 837 x 630=
49) 650 x 875=
50) 104 x 994=




Answers

1) 454 * 351 = 159354 2) 239 * 501 = 119739 3) 631 * 314 = 198134 4) 221 * 841 = 185861 5) 445 * 547 = 243415 6) 936 * 899 = 841464 7) 483 * 119 = 57477 8) 880 * 449 = 395120 9) 791 * 190 = 150290 10) 648 * 846 = 548208 11) 255 * 728 = 185640 12) 207 * 916 = 189612 13) 314 * 191 = 59974 14) 755 * 939 = 708945 15) 362 * 549 = 198738 16) 377 * 966 = 364182 17) 162 * 198 = 32076 18) 960 * 263 = 252480 19) 189 * 358 = 67662 20) 781 * 519 = 405339 21) 245 * 586 = 143570 22) 437 * 637 = 278369 23) 538 * 850 = 457300 24) 998 * 884 = 882232 25) 602 * 488 = 293776 26) 520 * 895 = 465400 27) 830 * 773 = 641590 28) 817 * 155 = 126635 29) 980 * 302 = 295960 30) 577 * 315 = 181755 31) 160 * 530 = 84800 32) 422 * 356 = 150232 33) 790 * 914 = 722060 34) 274 * 462 = 126588 35) 535 * 954 = 510390 36) 229 * 849 = 194421 37) 811 * 925 = 750175 38) 694 * 960 = 666240 39) 337 * 721 = 242977 40) 949 * 164 = 155636 41) 291 * 420 = 122220 42) 909 * 312 = 283608 43) 885 * 225 = 199125 44) 100 * 851 = 85100 45) 206 * 233 = 47998 46) 225 * 808 = 181800 47) 818 * 531 = 434358 48) 837 * 630 = 527310 49) 650 * 875 = 568750 50) 104 * 994 = 103376

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 37

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 37