1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 38

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 38

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on October 8, 2020.

Questions

1) 655 x 164=
2) 300 x 796=
3) 344 x 227=
4) 657 x 691=
5) 243 x 846=
6) 528 x 556=
7) 668 x 194=
8) 695 x 300=
9) 407 x 543=
10) 100 x 135=
11) 765 x 994=
12) 256 x 894=
13) 131 x 991=
14) 297 x 128=
15) 444 x 353=
16) 99 x 785=
17) 271 x 883=
18) 148 x 676=
19) 573 x 868=
20) 678 x 866=
21) 919 x 186=
22) 945 x 155=
23) 811 x 966=
24) 686 x 353=
25) 430 x 996=
26) 426 x 939=
27) 456 x 922=
28) 959 x 893=
29) 344 x 312=
30) 116 x 700=
31) 766 x 724=
32) 154 x 949=
33) 914 x 683=
34) 386 x 421=
35) 361 x 779=
36) 862 x 921=
37) 760 x 225=
38) 372 x 765=
39) 480 x 540=
40) 289 x 248=
41) 215 x 411=
42) 461 x 996=
43) 709 x 969=
44) 775 x 570=
45) 300 x 766=
46) 853 x 330=
47) 743 x 548=
48) 700 x 968=
49) 616 x 511=
50) 692 x 951=




Answers

1) 655 * 164 = 107420 2) 300 * 796 = 238800 3) 344 * 227 = 78088 4) 657 * 691 = 453987 5) 243 * 846 = 205578 6) 528 * 556 = 293568 7) 668 * 194 = 129592 8) 695 * 300 = 208500 9) 407 * 543 = 221001 10) 100 * 135 = 13500 11) 765 * 994 = 760410 12) 256 * 894 = 228864 13) 131 * 991 = 129821 14) 297 * 128 = 38016 15) 444 * 353 = 156732 16) 99 * 785 = 77715 17) 271 * 883 = 239293 18) 148 * 676 = 100048 19) 573 * 868 = 497364 20) 678 * 866 = 587148 21) 919 * 186 = 170934 22) 945 * 155 = 146475 23) 811 * 966 = 783426 24) 686 * 353 = 242158 25) 430 * 996 = 428280 26) 426 * 939 = 400014 27) 456 * 922 = 420432 28) 959 * 893 = 856387 29) 344 * 312 = 107328 30) 116 * 700 = 81200 31) 766 * 724 = 554584 32) 154 * 949 = 146146 33) 914 * 683 = 624262 34) 386 * 421 = 162506 35) 361 * 779 = 281219 36) 862 * 921 = 793902 37) 760 * 225 = 171000 38) 372 * 765 = 284580 39) 480 * 540 = 259200 40) 289 * 248 = 71672 41) 215 * 411 = 88365 42) 461 * 996 = 459156 43) 709 * 969 = 687021 44) 775 * 570 = 441750 45) 300 * 766 = 229800 46) 853 * 330 = 281490 47) 743 * 548 = 407164 48) 700 * 968 = 677600 49) 616 * 511 = 314776 50) 692 * 951 = 658092

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 38

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 38