1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 39

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 39

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 9, 2020.

Questions

1) 960 x 772=
2) 126 x 183=
3) 347 x 126=
4) 497 x 860=
5) 209 x 607=
6) 389 x 319=
7) 225 x 716=
8) 149 x 853=
9) 602 x 475=
10) 389 x 695=
11) 849 x 824=
12) 947 x 873=
13) 351 x 719=
14) 418 x 820=
15) 447 x 117=
16) 295 x 435=
17) 853 x 927=
18) 206 x 748=
19) 301 x 310=
20) 531 x 445=
21) 281 x 621=
22) 563 x 374=
23) 966 x 890=
24) 241 x 212=
25) 552 x 192=
26) 468 x 548=
27) 367 x 179=
28) 627 x 346=
29) 621 x 639=
30) 808 x 114=
31) 891 x 133=
32) 196 x 438=
33) 773 x 664=
34) 585 x 491=
35) 929 x 667=
36) 623 x 619=
37) 632 x 981=
38) 733 x 722=
39) 696 x 319=
40) 780 x 503=
41) 867 x 609=
42) 344 x 846=
43) 453 x 889=
44) 239 x 560=
45) 688 x 337=
46) 355 x 378=
47) 371 x 978=
48) 398 x 680=
49) 176 x 899=
50) 960 x 549=




Answers

1) 960 * 772 = 741120 2) 126 * 183 = 23058 3) 347 * 126 = 43722 4) 497 * 860 = 427420 5) 209 * 607 = 126863 6) 389 * 319 = 124091 7) 225 * 716 = 161100 8) 149 * 853 = 127097 9) 602 * 475 = 285950 10) 389 * 695 = 270355 11) 849 * 824 = 699576 12) 947 * 873 = 826731 13) 351 * 719 = 252369 14) 418 * 820 = 342760 15) 447 * 117 = 52299 16) 295 * 435 = 128325 17) 853 * 927 = 790731 18) 206 * 748 = 154088 19) 301 * 310 = 93310 20) 531 * 445 = 236295 21) 281 * 621 = 174501 22) 563 * 374 = 210562 23) 966 * 890 = 859740 24) 241 * 212 = 51092 25) 552 * 192 = 105984 26) 468 * 548 = 256464 27) 367 * 179 = 65693 28) 627 * 346 = 216942 29) 621 * 639 = 396819 30) 808 * 114 = 92112 31) 891 * 133 = 118503 32) 196 * 438 = 85848 33) 773 * 664 = 513272 34) 585 * 491 = 287235 35) 929 * 667 = 619643 36) 623 * 619 = 385637 37) 632 * 981 = 619992 38) 733 * 722 = 529226 39) 696 * 319 = 222024 40) 780 * 503 = 392340 41) 867 * 609 = 528003 42) 344 * 846 = 291024 43) 453 * 889 = 402717 44) 239 * 560 = 133840 45) 688 * 337 = 231856 46) 355 * 378 = 134190 47) 371 * 978 = 362838 48) 398 * 680 = 270640 49) 176 * 899 = 158224 50) 960 * 549 = 527040

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 39

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 39