1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 4

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 4

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 4, 2020.

Questions

1) 510 x 121=
2) 881 x 696=
3) 161 x 225=
4) 666 x 911=
5) 321 x 864=
6) 707 x 235=
7) 448 x 315=
8) 190 x 333=
9) 142 x 464=
10) 608 x 879=
11) 896 x 983=
12) 714 x 830=
13) 632 x 258=
14) 833 x 730=
15) 132 x 579=
16) 980 x 478=
17) 338 x 653=
18) 274 x 396=
19) 926 x 300=
20) 172 x 332=
21) 398 x 859=
22) 563 x 491=
23) 714 x 278=
24) 669 x 466=
25) 912 x 172=
26) 311 x 686=
27) 812 x 151=
28) 181 x 663=
29) 760 x 252=
30) 151 x 489=
31) 645 x 350=
32) 243 x 351=
33) 269 x 464=
34) 158 x 336=
35) 356 x 531=
36) 883 x 324=
37) 493 x 525=
38) 513 x 387=
39) 725 x 387=
40) 501 x 767=
41) 578 x 813=
42) 897 x 648=
43) 520 x 616=
44) 710 x 829=
45) 905 x 266=
46) 666 x 192=
47) 328 x 255=
48) 806 x 808=
49) 905 x 207=
50) 884 x 672=




Answers

1) 510 * 121 = 61710 2) 881 * 696 = 613176 3) 161 * 225 = 36225 4) 666 * 911 = 606726 5) 321 * 864 = 277344 6) 707 * 235 = 166145 7) 448 * 315 = 141120 8) 190 * 333 = 63270 9) 142 * 464 = 65888 10) 608 * 879 = 534432 11) 896 * 983 = 880768 12) 714 * 830 = 592620 13) 632 * 258 = 163056 14) 833 * 730 = 608090 15) 132 * 579 = 76428 16) 980 * 478 = 468440 17) 338 * 653 = 220714 18) 274 * 396 = 108504 19) 926 * 300 = 277800 20) 172 * 332 = 57104 21) 398 * 859 = 341882 22) 563 * 491 = 276433 23) 714 * 278 = 198492 24) 669 * 466 = 311754 25) 912 * 172 = 156864 26) 311 * 686 = 213346 27) 812 * 151 = 122612 28) 181 * 663 = 120003 29) 760 * 252 = 191520 30) 151 * 489 = 73839 31) 645 * 350 = 225750 32) 243 * 351 = 85293 33) 269 * 464 = 124816 34) 158 * 336 = 53088 35) 356 * 531 = 189036 36) 883 * 324 = 286092 37) 493 * 525 = 258825 38) 513 * 387 = 198531 39) 725 * 387 = 280575 40) 501 * 767 = 384267 41) 578 * 813 = 469914 42) 897 * 648 = 581256 43) 520 * 616 = 320320 44) 710 * 829 = 588590 45) 905 * 266 = 240730 46) 666 * 192 = 127872 47) 328 * 255 = 83640 48) 806 * 808 = 651248 49) 905 * 207 = 187335 50) 884 * 672 = 594048

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 4

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 4