1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 40

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 40

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 10, 2020.

Questions

1) 528 x 606=
2) 993 x 558=
3) 942 x 391=
4) 379 x 653=
5) 861 x 849=
6) 603 x 812=
7) 678 x 554=
8) 712 x 612=
9) 760 x 742=
10) 226 x 289=
11) 682 x 642=
12) 673 x 157=
13) 588 x 974=
14) 475 x 437=
15) 517 x 383=
16) 656 x 529=
17) 124 x 267=
18) 286 x 427=
19) 535 x 483=
20) 338 x 263=
21) 102 x 425=
22) 504 x 915=
23) 760 x 116=
24) 426 x 873=
25) 690 x 666=
26) 720 x 367=
27) 329 x 943=
28) 960 x 663=
29) 511 x 384=
30) 238 x 286=
31) 720 x 986=
32) 244 x 767=
33) 342 x 920=
34) 337 x 540=
35) 494 x 699=
36) 834 x 106=
37) 133 x 476=
38) 586 x 602=
39) 554 x 384=
40) 788 x 252=
41) 244 x 631=
42) 311 x 819=
43) 859 x 746=
44) 907 x 190=
45) 202 x 889=
46) 363 x 327=
47) 693 x 599=
48) 371 x 655=
49) 245 x 366=
50) 368 x 348=




Answers

1) 528 * 606 = 319968 2) 993 * 558 = 554094 3) 942 * 391 = 368322 4) 379 * 653 = 247487 5) 861 * 849 = 730989 6) 603 * 812 = 489636 7) 678 * 554 = 375612 8) 712 * 612 = 435744 9) 760 * 742 = 563920 10) 226 * 289 = 65314 11) 682 * 642 = 437844 12) 673 * 157 = 105661 13) 588 * 974 = 572712 14) 475 * 437 = 207575 15) 517 * 383 = 198011 16) 656 * 529 = 347024 17) 124 * 267 = 33108 18) 286 * 427 = 122122 19) 535 * 483 = 258405 20) 338 * 263 = 88894 21) 102 * 425 = 43350 22) 504 * 915 = 461160 23) 760 * 116 = 88160 24) 426 * 873 = 371898 25) 690 * 666 = 459540 26) 720 * 367 = 264240 27) 329 * 943 = 310247 28) 960 * 663 = 636480 29) 511 * 384 = 196224 30) 238 * 286 = 68068 31) 720 * 986 = 709920 32) 244 * 767 = 187148 33) 342 * 920 = 314640 34) 337 * 540 = 181980 35) 494 * 699 = 345306 36) 834 * 106 = 88404 37) 133 * 476 = 63308 38) 586 * 602 = 352772 39) 554 * 384 = 212736 40) 788 * 252 = 198576 41) 244 * 631 = 153964 42) 311 * 819 = 254709 43) 859 * 746 = 640814 44) 907 * 190 = 172330 45) 202 * 889 = 179578 46) 363 * 327 = 118701 47) 693 * 599 = 415107 48) 371 * 655 = 243005 49) 245 * 366 = 89670 50) 368 * 348 = 128064

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 40

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 40