1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 41

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 41

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on October 11, 2020.

Questions

1) 254 x 238=
2) 567 x 475=
3) 935 x 690=
4) 349 x 341=
5) 927 x 664=
6) 458 x 501=
7) 334 x 583=
8) 581 x 652=
9) 441 x 640=
10) 279 x 986=
11) 637 x 470=
12) 245 x 950=
13) 326 x 168=
14) 282 x 807=
15) 170 x 442=
16) 264 x 303=
17) 957 x 353=
18) 851 x 955=
19) 294 x 194=
20) 113 x 349=
21) 576 x 118=
22) 293 x 446=
23) 960 x 579=
24) 269 x 776=
25) 600 x 869=
26) 945 x 681=
27) 805 x 291=
28) 957 x 756=
29) 939 x 547=
30) 487 x 566=
31) 337 x 730=
32) 506 x 427=
33) 840 x 871=
34) 797 x 663=
35) 375 x 375=
36) 962 x 323=
37) 779 x 364=
38) 864 x 645=
39) 855 x 311=
40) 873 x 213=
41) 726 x 910=
42) 571 x 796=
43) 101 x 672=
44) 434 x 101=
45) 823 x 735=
46) 436 x 323=
47) 719 x 812=
48) 682 x 811=
49) 216 x 367=
50) 253 x 670=




Answers

1) 254 * 238 = 60452 2) 567 * 475 = 269325 3) 935 * 690 = 645150 4) 349 * 341 = 119009 5) 927 * 664 = 615528 6) 458 * 501 = 229458 7) 334 * 583 = 194722 8) 581 * 652 = 378812 9) 441 * 640 = 282240 10) 279 * 986 = 275094 11) 637 * 470 = 299390 12) 245 * 950 = 232750 13) 326 * 168 = 54768 14) 282 * 807 = 227574 15) 170 * 442 = 75140 16) 264 * 303 = 79992 17) 957 * 353 = 337821 18) 851 * 955 = 812705 19) 294 * 194 = 57036 20) 113 * 349 = 39437 21) 576 * 118 = 67968 22) 293 * 446 = 130678 23) 960 * 579 = 555840 24) 269 * 776 = 208744 25) 600 * 869 = 521400 26) 945 * 681 = 643545 27) 805 * 291 = 234255 28) 957 * 756 = 723492 29) 939 * 547 = 513633 30) 487 * 566 = 275642 31) 337 * 730 = 246010 32) 506 * 427 = 216062 33) 840 * 871 = 731640 34) 797 * 663 = 528411 35) 375 * 375 = 140625 36) 962 * 323 = 310726 37) 779 * 364 = 283556 38) 864 * 645 = 557280 39) 855 * 311 = 265905 40) 873 * 213 = 185949 41) 726 * 910 = 660660 42) 571 * 796 = 454516 43) 101 * 672 = 67872 44) 434 * 101 = 43834 45) 823 * 735 = 604905 46) 436 * 323 = 140828 47) 719 * 812 = 583828 48) 682 * 811 = 553102 49) 216 * 367 = 79272 50) 253 * 670 = 169510

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 41

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 41